Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Edinburg Srgv, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by David N. Calvillo, against Rialto Capital Advisors, Llc, represented by Heather Scott, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Marla Cuellar presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2019 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract (Oca) |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Reply
Date: January 31, 2022Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys
Date: February 17, 2022Response
Date: January 31, 2022Notice
Date: January 20, 2022Reply
Date: January 31, 2022Notice Sent
Date: November 15, 2021Response
Date: December 03, 2021Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Date: November 15, 2021Notice Sent
Date: November 08, 2021Notice Sent
Date: November 08, 2021Notice Sent
Date: September 09, 2021Notice Sent
Date: September 09, 2021Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Date: November 08, 2021Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Date: November 08, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: September 09, 2021Motion
Date: August 20, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: September 07, 2021Proposed Order
Date: September 07, 2021Proposed Order
Date: August 24, 2021Notice Sent
Date: August 06, 2021Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Date: August 06, 2021Notice Sent
Date: May 03, 2021Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Date: May 03, 2021Notice Sent
Date: April 07, 2021Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: April 07, 2021Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: January 19, 2021Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: January 15, 2021Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: November 13, 2020Notice Sent
Date: November 10, 2020Order Signed
Date: November 09, 2020Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: October 26, 2020Notice Sent
Date: October 29, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: October 29, 2020Response
Date: October 21, 2020Notice Sent
Date: September 23, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: September 23, 2020Notice Sent
Date: April 14, 2020Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Date: July 29, 2020Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: July 28, 2020Notice Sent
Date: July 29, 2020Notice Sent
Date: April 14, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 13, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 13, 2020Proposed Order
Date: March 12, 2020Order Setting Hearing
Date: March 12, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: March 12, 2020Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: November 27, 2019Order Setting Hearing
Date: November 27, 2019Motion to Dismiss, Filed
Date: November 27, 2019Proposed Order
Date: November 27, 2019Answer
Date: November 27, 2019Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: October 24, 2019Citation Issued
Date: September 26, 2019Original Petition (OCA)
Date: September 25, 2019Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys
Date: May 08, 2023Cover Letter
Date: January 20, 2023Notice Sent
Date: November 07, 2022Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: November 07, 2022Motion
Date: October 11, 2022Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: June 16, 2022Letter Received
Date: February 25, 2022Letter Received
Date: February 24, 2022Reply
Date: February 24, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: February 22, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: February 22, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: February 22, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: February 22, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: February 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Cuellar, Marla) | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Cuellar, Marla) | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order, Signed AGREED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AGREED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Control Order, Signed | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue AGREED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AGREED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Agreed Docket Control Order Agreed Docket Control Order |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter FILING JURY FEE FILING JURY FEE |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Entries case called. judy rochan for plaintiff, claudia flores for respondent. 40 jurors needed for a jury trial thats set for 10/10/23, pre trial for 10/5/23. jury fees paid by plaintiff along with dco. case called. judy rochan for plaintiff, claudia flores for respondent. 40 jurors needed for a jury trial thats set for 10/10/23, pre trial for 10/5/23. jury fees paid by plaintiff along with dco. |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Control Conference Hearing/Telephonic (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Cuellar, Marla) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.