Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gonzalez, Veronica, Hernandez, Marcos Antonio, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Stephen P. Carrigan, against City Of Alamo, Texas, Gonzalez, Veronica, Hidalgo County Sheriffs Office, represented by Preston E. Henrichson, Rosemary Conrad Sandoval, Stephen P. Carrigan, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Ricardo Rodriguez, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRicardo Rodriguez, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 14, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suit |
Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: September 09, 2022Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: August 05, 2022Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: July 11, 2022Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: June 24, 2022Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: June 14, 2022Proposed Order
Date: May 26, 2022Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: May 26, 2022Motion
Date: May 26, 2022Answer
Date: April 13, 2022Affidavit
Date: March 28, 2022Citation Issued
Date: March 03, 2022Request for Service
Date: March 02, 2022Amended
Date: March 02, 2022Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: February 01, 2022Defendant's Original Answer
Date: November 12, 2021Citation Issued
Date: October 14, 2021Request for Service
Date: October 14, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: October 14, 2021Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: October 07, 2022Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: December 07, 2022Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: March 01, 2023Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: January 30, 2023Request
Date: July 08, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: November 01, 2022Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: October 24, 2022Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: June 01, 2022Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: October 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Judge: Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr. |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Judge: Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr. |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery
Judge: Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr. |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Judge: Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr. |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PRESTON HENRICHSON AS COUNSEL FOR HIDALGO COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE AND FOR WITHDRAWAL OF RICARDO RODRIGUEZ, JR, AND ASSOCIATED COUNSEL ORDER SETTING HEARING ON UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PRESTON HENRICHSON AS COUNSEL FOR HIDALGO COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE AND FOR WITHDRAWAL OF RICARDO RODRIGUEZ, JR, AND ASSOCIATED COUNSEL Judge: Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr. |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery
Judge: Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr. |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Judge: Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr. |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery
Judge: Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr. |
|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Judge: Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr. |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Judge: Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.