Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Jose J. Reyna, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Jaime E. Tijerina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJaime E. Tijerina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2019 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Order, Signed
Date: September 26, 2019Order, Signed
Date: September 26, 2019Order of Commitment, Signed
Date: September 26, 2019Proposed Order
Date: September 24, 2019Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: September 24, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Cost Waived HABEAS CORPUS HABEAS CORPUS |
|
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Order of Commitment Returned by Sheriff | |
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER GRANTING/DENYING BOND REDUCTION ORDER GRANTING/DENYING BOND REDUCTION |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed GRANTING/DENYING BOND REDUCTION GRANTING/DENYING BOND REDUCTION |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed ORDER MODIFYING BOND RELEASE CONDITIONS ORDER MODIFYING BOND RELEASE CONDITIONS |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Order of Commitment, Signed | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Entries ORDER GRANTING/DENYING WRIT, SIGNED. (ENV #37099610) -AG ORDER GRANTING/DENYING WRIT, SIGNED. (ENV #37099610) -AG |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Atty Reyna present. Def present. Atty Barrera and Lopez present for State. Bail reduction granted with Court ordered bond conditions. mdl Atty Reyna present. Def present. Atty Barrera and Lopez present for State. Bail reduction granted with Court ordered bond conditions. mdl |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Habeas Corpus (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Tijerina, Jaime) Result: Granted | |
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER GRANTING/DENYING BOND REDUCTION ORDER GRANTING/DENYING BOND REDUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.