Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Guerrero, Edward, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hector L. Rodriguez, against Sandoval, Jesse, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Reyna, Rose G. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Plaintiff |
Notice Sent
Date: February 10, 2022Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: February 10, 2022Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, Signed
Date: December 05, 2022Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: December 09, 2022Motion to Dismiss, Filed
Date: December 02, 2022Notice
Date: January 18, 2022Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: January 18, 2022Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: January 18, 2022Notice Sent
Date: January 19, 2022Final Order to Close File (Removal to Federal Court)
Date: December 22, 2021Citation Issued
Date: December 08, 2021Defendant's Original Answer
Date: November 29, 2021Other
Date: November 29, 2021Amended Petition
Date: November 16, 2021Citation Issued
Date: October 27, 2021Citation Issued
Date: October 08, 2021Amended Petition
Date: October 01, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: October 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial on Merits Case Disposed CANCELED Trial on Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Reyna, Rose G., Reyna, Rose G.) Case Disposed 2-3 days Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Comment (AGREED ORDER |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial on Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) 2-3 days 2-3 days Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Pre-Trial Hearing Case Disposed CANCELED Final Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officers Reyna, Rose G., Reyna, Rose G.) Case Disposed Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Comment (AGREED ORDER |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.)
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tickler Case Disposed CANCELED Tickler (5:30 PM) (Judicial Officers Reyna, Rose G., Reyna, Rose G.) Case Disposed CLERKS TO DISPOSE CASE Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Comment (AGREED ORDER |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Costing Note COURT COSTS PAID SEE EVENT FROM 01/05/2022 COURT COSTS PAID SEE EVENT FROM 01/05/2022 Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Comment (AGREED ORDER |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Comment (AGREED ORDER |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
First Pretrial Case Disposed CANCELED First Pretrial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Case Disposed Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Comment (AGREED ORDER |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
First Pretrial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.)
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, Signed AGREED ORDER AGREED ORDER Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Comment (AGREED ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.