Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Carlos E. Ortegon, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Jaime E. Tijerina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJaime E. Tijerina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2019 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Order, Signed
Date: September 24, 2019Proposed Order
Date: September 19, 2019Proposed Order
Date: September 18, 2019Proposed Order
Date: September 17, 2019Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: September 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent AMENDED ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, DENIED AMENDED ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, DENIED |
|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Atty A. Barrera present for State. Atty Carlos Ortegon present. Def. present in jail. Court denied Writ/Bond reduction. -ag Atty A. Barrera present for State. Atty Carlos Ortegon present. Def. present in jail. Court denied Writ/Bond reduction. -ag |
|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed AMENDED ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AMENDED ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS |
|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Entries AMENDED ORDER, SIGNED. DENIED. (ENV #37041997) -AG AMENDED ORDER, SIGNED. DENIED. (ENV #37041997) -AG |
|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ Returned Served | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Habeas Corpus (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Tijerina, Jaime) Result: Held | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Judge's Queue AMENDED ORDER ON WRIT (ENV #37041997) -AG AMENDED ORDER ON WRIT (ENV #37041997) -AG |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER OF SETTING ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ORDER OF SETTING ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ Issued Writ Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.