Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gonzalez, Alejandro, filed a(n) All Other Civil Cases (Oca) case represented by Jorge A. Salinas, against Donna Independant School District, represented by David L Flores, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Jaime E. Tijerina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJaime E. Tijerina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2019 |
CategoryAll Other Civil Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
|
Citation Issued
Date: September 16, 2019Notice of Removal to Federal Court, Filed (OCA) (1b)
Date: October 15, 2019Original Petition (OCA)
Date: September 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Tickler (6:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Tijerina, Jaime) | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Removal to Federal Court, Filed (OCA) (1b) | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation Issued |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation Donna Independant School District Served 09/18/2019 Returned 09/18/2019 | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Service | |
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.