Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Hernandez, Alexandro Rubio, Martinez, Rubio Guadalupe, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brandon P. Mundt, against City Of Pharr, Texas, Vazaldua, Gilberto Moises, represented by John-Michael Wyman Hayward, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Fernando G. Mancias presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2022 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: December 14, 2023Citation Issued
Date: December 13, 2023Proposed Order
Date: November 06, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: December 01, 2023Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: November 16, 2023Mediator's Report
Date: December 05, 2023Notice Sent
Date: November 07, 2023Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: November 16, 2023Notice Sent
Date: March 10, 2023Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: November 14, 2022Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: November 06, 2023Proposed Order
Date: November 17, 2023Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: November 29, 2023Amended Petition
Date: December 12, 2023Rule 11 Agreement Reviewed and Returned by Court
Date: November 14, 2022Fiat
Date: November 08, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: November 04, 2022Amended
Date: November 29, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: November 06, 2023Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: April 03, 2023Proposed Order
Date: November 13, 2023Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: November 30, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: November 14, 2023Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: November 04, 2022Notice Sent
Date: November 08, 2022Proposed Order
Date: November 28, 2023Proposed Order
Date: November 20, 2023Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: November 13, 2023Original Petition (OCA)
Date: October 07, 2022Proposed Order
Date: November 04, 2022Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: March 10, 2023Notice of Intent to Take Written Deposition
Date: January 31, 2024Notice
Date: November 15, 2022Notice
Date: November 16, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: November 29, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: November 16, 2023Amended Petition
Date: November 15, 2022Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: December 06, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: November 14, 2023Defendant's Original Answer
Date: January 08, 2024Notice Sent
Date: December 07, 2022Notice Sent
Date: November 14, 2023Defendant's Original Answer
Date: November 04, 2022Cover Letter
Date: December 12, 2023Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: November 17, 2023Defendant's Original Answer
Date: November 30, 2022Citation Issued
Date: October 11, 2022Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: November 28, 2023Response
Date: November 20, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: November 07, 2023Notice of Filing of Billing Records
Date: June 23, 2023Defendant's Original Answer
Date: November 28, 2023Letter Received
Date: October 11, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: November 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Mancias, Fernando G) | |
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Final Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Mancias, Fernando G) | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Tickler (4:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Mancias, Fernando G) HAS DCO BEEN FILED? 01/05/2024 Reset by Court to 01/25/2024 01/25/2024 Reset by Court to 02/22/2024 02/22/2024 Reset by Court to 03/07/2024 HAS DCO BEEN FILED? |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Take Written Deposition | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer TO PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED PETITION TO PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED PETITION |
|
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Tickler (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Mancias, Fernando G) HAS DCO BEEN FILED? HAS DCO BEEN FILED? |
|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION (VIA ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCING) KYLE REINEN, PT, DPT, CSCS, CPC, ACSM, CPT NOVEMBER 27, 2023 ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION (VIA ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCING) KYLE REINEN, PT, DPT, CSCS, CPC, ACSM, CPT NOVEMBER 27, 2023 |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation Issued |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation Sugar Transport, LLC Served 12/18/2023 Returned 12/27/2023 Star Transport, Inc. Unserved | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition PLAINTIFFS THIRD PLAINTIFFS THIRD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.