Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Perez, Jesus Martin, Rivera, Virginia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Eduardo "Eddie" Ramirez, against Zamora, Israel, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts 206th District Court with Rose Guerra Reyna presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2022 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House206th District Court |
Notice Sent
Date: December 14, 2023Notice
Date: August 17, 2023Citation Issued
Date: December 15, 2023Order Signed
Date: December 14, 2023Amended
Date: December 13, 2023Notice Sent
Date: October 13, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: November 16, 2023Application
Date: November 15, 2023Order for Continuance, Signed
Date: October 13, 2023Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: October 13, 2023Order for Motion for Alternative Service, Signed
Date: September 02, 2022Original Petition (OCA)
Date: August 12, 2022Notice Sent
Date: December 07, 2022Motion to Retain, Filed
Date: January 11, 2023Notice Sent
Date: September 02, 2022Notice Sent
Date: January 17, 2023Order, Signed
Date: January 13, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: January 12, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: December 07, 2022Citation Issued
Date: August 16, 2022Motion for Substitute Service, Filed
Date: September 02, 2022Notice Sent
Date: November 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Tickler (5:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) REVIEW FILE REVIEW FILE |
|
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation Issued |
|
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ Zamora, Israel Unserved | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO ISSUE WRIT OF SCIRE FACIAS ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO ISSUE WRIT OF SCIRE FACIAS |
|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Signed DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO ISSUE WRIT OF SCIRE FACIAS DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO ISSUE WRIT OF SCIRE FACIAS |
|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) RE: Application for Writ of Scire Facias with supporting documentation to be filed and/or DWOP Hearing RE: Application for Writ of Scire Facias with supporting documentation to be filed and/or DWOP Hearing |
|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Entries CASE CALLED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE/DWOP HRG; ATTY LUCIA CEASER PRESENT; THE COURT GRANTED THE APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF SCIRE FACIAS. CASE CALLED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE/DWOP HRG; ATTY LUCIA CEASER PRESENT; THE COURT GRANTED THE APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF SCIRE FACIAS. |
|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO ISSUE WRIT OF SCIRE FACIAS - SENT TO DC ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO ISSUE WRIT OF SCIRE FACIAS - SENT TO DC |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended FIRST APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF SCIRE FACIAS FIRST APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF SCIRE FACIAS |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO ISSUE WRIT OF SCIRE FACIAS ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO ISSUE WRIT OF SCIRE FACIAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.