Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Garcia, David, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Osiris A. Gonzalez, against Moore, Lyles, Mccarty & Mcgilvray, L.L.P., Moore, Richard L, represented by J. Michael Moore, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Librado Keno Vasquez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 09, 2022 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other (Oca) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Response
Date: February 05, 2024Rule 203 Certification
Date: December 14, 2023Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: September 11, 2023Rule 203 Certification
Date: December 14, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: September 11, 2023Citation Issued
Date: August 09, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: January 03, 2024Order Setting Hearing
Date: December 07, 2023Proposed Order
Date: February 07, 2024Notice Sent
Date: January 03, 2024Notice
Date: September 11, 2023Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: October 19, 2023Notice Sent
Date: January 03, 2024Amended Answer
Date: February 07, 2024Order Setting Hearing
Date: November 16, 2023Original Petition (OCA)
Date: August 09, 2022Notice Sent
Date: October 19, 2023Reply
Date: February 07, 2024Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: January 03, 2024Defendant's Original Answer
Date: September 12, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: December 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion For Summary Judgment Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno") Defs. No Evidence 2. Plts Motion to Compel Defs. No Evidence 2. Plts Motion to Compel |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS, RICHARD L. MOORE, INDIVIDUALLY, AND MOORE, LYLES, MCCARTY & MCGILVRAY, L.L.P. FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS, RICHARD L. MOORE, INDIVIDUALLY, AND MOORE, LYLES, MCCARTY & MCGILVRAY, L.L.P. |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply TO THE GARCIA'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO THE GARCIA'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Response TO DEFENDANTS' NO-EVIDENCE AND TRADITIONAL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARYJUDGMENT TO DEFENDANTS' NO-EVIDENCE AND TRADITIONAL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARYJUDGMENT |
|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed ON PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL ON PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ORDER SETTING HEARING |
|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing, Signed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.