Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cardona, Jose, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Richard Anthony Hinojosa, against City Of Mcallen, Mmgj South Texas Llc, represented by Andrew J. Szygenda, Isaac J. Tawil, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Party(MMGJ South Texas LLC presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 16, 2019 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other (Oca) |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suit |
Citation Issued
Date: July 22, 2019Order for Partial Non-Suit, Signed
Date: February 03, 2020Notice
Date: June 04, 2020Defendant's Original Answer
Date: August 16, 2019Original Petition (OCA)
Date: July 16, 2019Proposed Order
Date: January 24, 2020Notice Sent
Date: February 04, 2020Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: September 16, 2020Defendant's Original Answer
Date: August 13, 2019Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: January 24, 2020Notice Sent
Date: October 19, 2020Proposed Order
Date: October 19, 2020Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: March 29, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: September 17, 2020Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: October 19, 2020Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: September 25, 2020Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: October 12, 2023Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: October 10, 2023Notice Sent
Date: September 26, 2023Notice Sent
Date: November 01, 2021Proposed Order
Date: October 10, 2023Motion
Date: January 12, 2023Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys
Date: January 12, 2023Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: September 18, 2023Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: September 27, 2023Notice Sent
Date: September 17, 2020Order for Continuance, Signed
Date: September 27, 2022Notice Sent
Date: September 26, 2023Response
Date: October 10, 2023Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: September 25, 2023Notice Sent
Date: January 23, 2023Amended
Date: October 10, 2023Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: November 23, 2022Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: January 12, 2023Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: September 28, 2023Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: March 17, 2022Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: September 28, 2021Amended
Date: July 13, 2023Notice Sent
Date: September 28, 2022Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: October 29, 2021Order for Continuance, Signed
Date: September 30, 2021Order Signed
Date: March 30, 2021Order Returned by Court
Date: March 31, 2021Proposed Order
Date: March 29, 2021Proposed Order
Date: March 29, 2021Proposed Order
Date: October 28, 2021Proposed Order
Date: September 28, 2021Notice Sent
Date: September 30, 2021Agreed Order, Signed
Date: March 30, 2021Notice Sent
Date: March 31, 2021Proposed Order
Date: March 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed PLAINTIFF'S PLAINTIFF'S Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Party(MMGJ South Texas LLC |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Continuance, Signed AGREED MOTION AGREED MOTION Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Party(MMGJ South Texas LLC |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Entries D'S S/E'S AND D'S PTTJ ARE STILL PENDING; ONLY THE TRIAL DATES WERE PASSED D'S S/E'S AND D'S PTTJ ARE STILL PENDING; ONLY THE TRIAL DATES WERE PASSED Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Party(MMGJ South Texas LLC |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Party(MMGJ South Texas LLC |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Continuance, Signed OCTOBER TRIAL DATES PASSED OCTOBER TRIAL DATES PASSED Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Party(MMGJ South Texas LLC |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing TELEPHONIC DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE TELEPHONIC DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Party(MMGJ South Texas LLC |
|
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Special Exceptions Attorney Agreement CANCELED Special Exceptions (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Attorney Agreement D-CITY OF MCALLEN'S S/E'S; D-CITY OF MCALLEN'S PLEA TO THE JURISDICTION Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Party(MMGJ South Texas LLC |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance, Filed OF HEARING OF HEARING Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Party(MMGJ South Texas LLC |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order GRANTING PLAINTIFFS OPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS PLEA TO THE JURISDICTION AND ISSUING NEW HEARING DATE GRANTING PLAINTIFFS OPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS PLEA TO THE JURISDICTION AND ISSUING NEW HEARING DATE Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Party(MMGJ South Texas LLC |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response TO DEFENDANTS PLEA TO THE JURISDICTION TO DEFENDANTS PLEA TO THE JURISDICTION Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Party(MMGJ South Texas LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.