Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Martinez-Soto, Jose Alberto, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Raymond L. Thomas, against Citadel Management, Llc, Equity Llc, Directions, Flores Villarreal, Marco Antonio, Ginn, David, Perrysburg, Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Kenneth Grubbs, Mark B Rabe, Orlando Jimenez, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts 398th District Court with Librado Keno Vasquez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Other Real Property (Oca) |
Last RefreshedMay 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court House398th District Court |
This complaint is filed by Jose Alberto Martinez Soto against Sharyland Residential Community Property Owners Association, Inc. and Perrysburg, LLC. The complaint involves a wrongful foreclosure and potential wrongful eviction of Soto's residential h...
Defendant's Original Answer
Date: August 18, 2022Amended
Date: September 23, 2022Citation Issued
Date: July 18, 2022Defendant's Original Answer
Date: October 05, 2022Original Petition (OCA)
Date: July 18, 2022Notice Sent
Date: January 19, 2024Amended Petition
Date: September 18, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 04, 2024Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: August 24, 2023Order on Motion for Substitution of Counsel, Signed
Date: April 21, 2023Proposed Order
Date: September 01, 2023Designation of Experts
Date: January 10, 2024Designation of Experts
Date: December 11, 2023Order to Substitute Counsel, Signed
Date: January 27, 2023Citation Issued
Date: April 15, 2024Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: March 26, 2024Motion
Date: March 25, 2024Order Returned by Court
Date: September 18, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: March 25, 2024Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: March 26, 2024Notice Sent
Date: March 28, 2024Notice Sent
Date: April 05, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: August 28, 2023Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: April 25, 2023Notice Sent
Date: April 21, 2023Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: April 15, 2024Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: January 16, 2024Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: January 29, 2024Order Setting Hearing
Date: January 16, 2024Motion
Date: March 25, 2024Notice Sent
Date: January 27, 2023Request
Date: January 04, 2024Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: September 19, 2023Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: April 05, 2023Proposed Order
Date: September 18, 2023Proposed Order
Date: January 17, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 05, 2023Proposed Order
Date: August 07, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 15, 2024Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: January 10, 2023Motion for Substitution of Counsel, Filed
Date: April 19, 2023Notice Sent
Date: August 29, 2023Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: April 05, 2023Motion for Substitution of Counsel, Filed
Date: January 17, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: January 19, 2024Notice Sent
Date: April 10, 2024Proposed Order
Date: March 25, 2024Designation of Experts
Date: January 09, 2024Notice Sent
Date: September 19, 2023Motion For Leave
Date: September 01, 2023Notice Sent
Date: April 12, 2024Order Setting Hearing
Date: August 16, 2023Notice Sent
Date: September 11, 2023Notice Sent
Date: April 16, 2024Notice
Date: January 04, 2024Notice Sent
Date: April 04, 2024Motion
Date: August 07, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 12, 2024Citation Issued
Date: January 05, 2024Order Setting Hearing
Date: March 25, 2024Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: August 29, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: September 07, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: September 11, 2023Order, Signed
Date: April 12, 2024Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 10, 2024Request
Date: April 12, 2024Response
Date: September 18, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: August 08, 2023Rule 11 Agreement Reviewed and Returned by Court
Date: April 25, 2023Proposed Order
Date: April 19, 2023Service Issued
Date: January 05, 2024Notice
Date: January 10, 2024Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 16, 2024Counter Claim/Counter Petition (Fee)
Date: April 12, 2024Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: April 12, 2024Order Setting Hearing
Date: September 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno") | |
September 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Final Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno") | |
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion For Summary Judgment Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno") Plts No Evidence (Perrysburg LLC) 2. Plts No Evidence MSJ ( Paola Plaza and Walter Plaza) 3. Plts Traditional MSJ against Perrysburg,LLC Plts No Evidence (Perrysburg LLC) 2. Plts No Evidence MSJ ( Paola Plaza and Walter Plaza) 3. Plts Traditional MSJ against Perrysburg,LLC |
|
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion For Summary Judgment Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno") Plts No Evidence (Perrysburg LLC) 2. Plts No Evidence MSJ ( Paola Plaza and Walter Plaza) Plts No Evidence (Perrysburg LLC) 2. Plts No Evidence MSJ ( Paola Plaza and Walter Plaza) |
|
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion For Summary Judgment Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno") Plts No Evidence Plts No Evidence |
|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno") (Defs) (Defs) |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed defs motion for continuance set for 4/30/24 @ 8:00 a.m defs motion for continuance set for 4/30/24 @ 8:00 a.m |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.