Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Vantage Bank Texas, filed a(n) All Other Civil Cases (Oca) case represented by Daniel G. Gurwitz, against Plasencia, Rodolfo, represented by Mark A. Weitz, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts 275th District Court with Marla Cuellar presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 07, 2023 |
CategoryAll Other Civil Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedMay 08, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
|
Filing Court House275th District Court |
Original Petition (OCA)
Date: July 07, 2023Response
Date: February 20, 2024Defendant's Original Answer
Date: July 21, 2023Citation Issued
Date: July 12, 2023Notice Sent
Date: November 08, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: January 24, 2024Response
Date: February 27, 2024Notice Sent
Date: January 25, 2024Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: February 26, 2024Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: January 18, 2024Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: November 08, 2023Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: November 08, 2023Objection
Date: February 27, 2024Answer
Date: July 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2025 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Cuellar, Marla) | |
March 19, 2025 | Docket Event | Preferential Trial (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Cuellar, Marla) | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (ORAL HEARING) Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (ORAL HEARING) |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ORDER SETTING HEARING |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Response TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT S CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT S CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Objection TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT RODOLFO NAVARRO PLASENCIA AND CYNTHIA GUTIERREZ TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT RODOLFO NAVARRO PLASENCIA AND CYNTHIA GUTIERREZ |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER SETTING ORAL HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DEFENDANT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER SETTING ORAL HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DEFENDANT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing ORAL HEARING ON PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DEFENDANT S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORAL HEARING ON PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DEFENDANT S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion For Summary Judgment Submission (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Cuellar, Marla) | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.