Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Doe, Jane, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Weldon G. Nixon, against Rmtx Associates, Llc D B A Renaissance Casa De Palmas, represented by Chaz D. Klaes, Michael S. Beckelman, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts 332nd District Court with Mario E. Ramirez, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 08, 2020 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other (Oca) |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House332nd District Court |
Order Signed
Date: October 07, 2022Agreed Order, Signed
Date: January 29, 2024Proposed Order
Date: April 19, 2024Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: March 21, 2024Amended Petition
Date: December 27, 2023Notice Sent
Date: January 11, 2023Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: March 01, 2021Order Signed
Date: August 10, 2022Order for Continuance, Signed
Date: December 07, 2022Supplemental
Date: September 27, 2022Verification
Date: April 18, 2024Amended
Date: April 19, 2024Original Petition (OCA)
Date: July 08, 2020Proposed Order
Date: April 18, 2024Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: July 21, 2021Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: December 02, 2022Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: October 17, 2022Notice Sent
Date: May 06, 2022Notice
Date: April 22, 2024Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: October 27, 2023Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: October 14, 2021Notice Sent
Date: August 03, 2023Letter Received
Date: March 22, 2024Proposed Order
Date: October 13, 2021Defendant's Original Answer
Date: July 31, 2020Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: August 03, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: September 08, 2022Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: April 26, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: May 06, 2022Notice Sent
Date: August 29, 2022Proposed Order
Date: April 18, 2024Notice Sent
Date: December 07, 2022Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: September 12, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: August 23, 2023Motion
Date: September 08, 2022Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: April 25, 2024Notice Sent
Date: July 10, 2020Witness List
Date: April 22, 2024Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: October 07, 2022Motion for Sanctions
Date: April 16, 2024Response
Date: May 24, 2022Response
Date: April 22, 2024Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: December 20, 2022Notice of Hearing, Filed
Date: April 02, 2024Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: October 17, 2023Notice Sent
Date: January 10, 2024Proposed Order
Date: July 24, 2023Amended Petition
Date: April 15, 2024Designation
Date: April 15, 2024Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: April 11, 2024Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 16, 2024Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: July 24, 2023Notice Sent
Date: April 16, 2024Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: January 10, 2024Proposed Order
Date: January 02, 2024Motion for Substitution of Counsel, Filed
Date: September 25, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: July 23, 2021Proposed Order
Date: April 15, 2024Notice of Hearing, Filed
Date: September 27, 2022Witness List
Date: April 15, 2024Notice of Hearing, Filed
Date: April 19, 2024Motion to Compel
Date: June 09, 2022Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: April 13, 2021Request
Date: April 22, 2024Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: April 15, 2024Jury Demand
Date: September 23, 2021Notice Sent
Date: July 23, 2021Notice Sent
Date: October 07, 2022Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: November 09, 2022Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: September 29, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: July 21, 2021Order, Signed
Date: July 10, 2020Notice Sent
Date: January 30, 2024Notice Sent
Date: October 04, 2023List
Date: April 22, 2024Response
Date: April 22, 2024Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: May 25, 2022Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: April 18, 2024Notice Sent
Date: May 13, 2022Citation Issued
Date: July 09, 2020Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: August 22, 2022Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: October 06, 2022Amended Petition
Date: February 01, 2024Proposed Order
Date: September 08, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: August 26, 2022Order on Motion for Substitution of Counsel, Signed
Date: October 03, 2023Designation of Experts
Date: January 07, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: March 31, 2022TRCP 193.7 Notice of Intent
Date: April 03, 2024Designation of Experts
Date: February 28, 2024Order for Continuance, Signed
Date: May 13, 2022Proposed Order
Date: July 09, 2020Order Returned by Court
Date: May 10, 2022Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: January 11, 2023Response
Date: April 18, 2024Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: April 15, 2024Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: April 28, 2023Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: December 28, 2023Notice Sent
Date: August 10, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: January 02, 2024Notice
Date: April 22, 2024Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: April 04, 2024Notice of Change of Address
Date: April 16, 2024Notice of Hearing, Filed
Date: September 22, 2022List
Date: April 15, 2024Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: May 02, 2024Amended
Date: August 22, 2022Proposed Order
Date: May 02, 2024Reply
Date: April 19, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Status Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) | |
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) AND D'S MOTION TO USE P'S TRUE NAME AT TRIAL AND D'S MOTION TO USE P'S TRUE NAME AT TRIAL |
|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ORDER REGARDING TRIAL DATE ORDER REGARDING TRIAL DATE |
|
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance, Filed OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL |
|
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO USE PLAINTIFFS TRUE NAME AT TRIAL ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO USE PLAINTIFFS TRUE NAME AT TRIAL |
|
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion DEFENDANT???S MOTION TO USE PLAINTIFF???S TRUE NAME AT TRIAL DEFENDANT???S MOTION TO USE PLAINTIFF???S TRUE NAME AT TRIAL |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Selection (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) | |
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Status Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Result: Passed | |
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing Reset CANCELED Status Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Reset |
|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) (JURY SELECTION = 5/1/24) (JURY SELECTION = 5/1/24) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.