Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Campos, Laura A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Fernando G. Mancias, against Cantu, Ben, Contreras, Roberto, Guajardo, Arturo, Mario, Garza., Navarro, Roy, (total of 9) See All represented by Carlos E. Hernandez, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Rose Guerra Reyna presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2001 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Motion
Date: January 12, 2007Order for Non-Suit, Signed
Date: January 25, 2007Motion for Non-Suit, Filed
Date: January 25, 2007Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: June 30, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Court Cost Waived C-2223-01-D 08/28/2008 COURT COST/$0.00/WAI cost file #2 only (file#1 missing) COURT COST/$0.00/WAIVED/REFUND (C/C) C-2223-01-D 08/28/2008 COURT COST/$0.00/WAI cost file #2 only (file#1 missing) COURT COST/$0.00/WAIVED/REFUND (C/C) |
|
February 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Copies Mailed to Attorney(s) C-2223-01-D 02/16/2007 COPIES MAILED TO ATT (ORDER FOR NONSUIT AT TO PSJA ISD) COPIES MAILED TO ATTY(S) (COPY) C-2223-01-D 02/16/2007 COPIES MAILED TO ATT (ORDER FOR NONSUIT AT TO PSJA ISD) COPIES MAILED TO ATTY(S) (COPY) |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit, Signed ORDER FOR NONSUIT, SIGNED (OFN) Vol./Book 1176, Page 282 ORDER FOR NONSUIT, SIGNED (OFN) |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion for Non-Suit, Filed C-2223-01-D 01/25/2007 MOTION FOR NON-SUIT, PS MOTION FOR NON-SUIT, FILED. (MFNS) C-2223-01-D 01/25/2007 MOTION FOR NON-SUIT, PS MOTION FOR NON-SUIT, FILED. (MFNS) |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Final Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) 1). Deft's Motion for Ruling 1). Deft's Motion for Ruling |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Court Entries C-2223-01-D 01/25/2007 COURTROOM ENTRIES CASE CALLED FOR FINA PRE-TRIAL HRG; JUDGE MANCIAS PRESENT AND ANNOUNCED MOTION FOR NONSUIT FILED; ORDER FOR NONSUIT AS TO PHARR SAN JUAN ALAMO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT COURTROOM ENTRIES (COURTROOM) C-2223-01-D 01/25/2007 COURTROOM ENTRIES CASE CALLED FOR FINA PRE-TRIAL HRG; JUDGE MANCIAS PRESENT AND ANNOUNCED MOTION FOR NONSUIT FILED; ORDER FOR NONSUIT AS TO PHARR SAN JUAN ALAMO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT COURTROOM ENTRIES (COURTROOM) |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Disposition ($DISP) ($DISP) |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing C-2223-01-D 01/17/2007 ORDER SETTING HEARIN HRG. ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RULING SET FOR 2/25/07 AT 8:30 A.M. - NOTICE FAXED TO MR. BARRERA ORDER SETTING HEARING SIGNED (OSHS) C-2223-01-D 01/17/2007 ORDER SETTING HEARIN HRG. ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RULING SET FOR 2/25/07 AT 8:30 A.M. - NOTICE FAXED TO MR. BARRERA ORDER SETTING HEARING SIGNED (OSHS) |
|
January 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion C-2223-01-D 01/12/2007 MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RULING, FILED/PS MOTION (MOT) C-2223-01-D 01/12/2007 MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RULING, FILED/PS MOTION (MOT) |
|
December 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Court Entries C-2223-01-D 12/13/2006 COURT ENTRIES AS PER PATTY W/ MARIO BARRRERA NTPT ON 12/14/06 @ 8:30 A.M. COURT ENTRIES (COURT) C-2223-01-D 12/13/2006 COURT ENTRIES AS PER PATTY W/ MARIO BARRRERA NTPT ON 12/14/06 @ 8:30 A.M. COURT ENTRIES (COURT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.