Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rainey, Mark Jeffery, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ramon Rosales, Jr., against Vargas, Enrique, Morado, Jose, Jr., represented by Lucila Alvarado, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Noe Gonzalez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2001 |
CategoryAuto Damages |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Disposition ($DISP) ($DISP) |
|
January 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal without Prejudice, Signed Global Disposition: Order of Dismissal without Prejudice, Signed Global Disposition: Order of Dismissal without Prejudice, Signed |
|
January 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO CLERK (FRTC) File Returned to Clerk FILE RETURNED TO CLERK (FRTC) |
|
January 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Court Entries C-2128-01-G 01/12/2006 COURT ENTRY ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE=SGN NG/ec COURT ENTRY (CE) C-2128-01-G 01/12/2006 COURT ENTRY ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE=SGN NG/ec COURT ENTRY (CE) |
|
December 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion C-2128-01-G 12/15/2005 MOTION MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE, FILED MOTION (MOT) C-2128-01-G 12/15/2005 MOTION MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE, FILED MOTION (MOT) |
|
June 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Trial on Merits (8:01 AM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Noe) agreed cont. agreed cont. |
|
June 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Hearing (8:01 AM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Noe) agreed cont. agreed cont. |
|
April 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO CLERK (FRTC) File Returned to Clerk FILE RETURNED TO CLERK (FRTC) |
|
April 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Court Entries C-2128-01-G 04/26/2005 COURT ENTRY ORDER GRANTING AGREED MTN FOR CONTINUANCE=SGN NG/ec; JUNE 13.2005 TRIAL CONT. COURT ENTRY (CE) C-2128-01-G 04/26/2005 COURT ENTRY ORDER GRANTING AGREED MTN FOR CONTINUANCE=SGN NG/ec; JUNE 13.2005 TRIAL CONT. COURT ENTRY (CE) |
|
April 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE MAILED (NM) Notice Mailed NOTICE MAILED (NM) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.