Case Last Refreshed: 4 days ago
Fisher, Shawnya, The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Regina Regi Richardson, represented by Regina Regi Richardson, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts 398th District Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 17, 2024 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Filing Court House398th District Court |
Proposed Order
Date: April 17, 2024Writ Issued
Date: April 18, 2024Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: April 17, 2024Notice Sent
Date: April 18, 2024Order of Commitment, Signed
Date: April 24, 2024Proposed Order
Date: April 17, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent to HCSO ORDER OF COMMITMENT ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Order of Commitment, Signed | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Writ of Habeas Corpus (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Esparza, Larry) | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Entries CASE CALLED BY JUDGE ESPARZA, ATTY REGI RICHARDSON PRESENT FOR DEF. ANALIZ VARGAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. BOND REDUCED TO $5,000 PR. CASE CALLED BY JUDGE ESPARZA, ATTY REGI RICHARDSON PRESENT FOR DEF. ANALIZ VARGAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. BOND REDUCED TO $5,000 PR. |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Writ Issued Writ Issued |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Writ Issued Writ Issued |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Writ FISHER, SHAWNYA Served 04/18/2024 Returned 04/19/2024 | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.