Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Maldonado, Hilda, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Timothy Audrey Davis, against Energy Vision Team, Llc, Rincon, Ramon Francisco, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Marla Cuellar presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2020 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Citation Issued
Date: August 18, 2023Request for Service
Date: August 18, 2023Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: March 03, 2023Writ of Scire Facias
Date: July 03, 2023Motion
Date: May 08, 2023Suggestion of Death
Date: May 08, 2023Letter Received
Date: June 29, 2023Motion
Date: September 03, 2021Subpoena Issued
Date: September 03, 2021Subpoena Issued
Date: September 02, 2021Proposed Order
Date: September 02, 2021Motion
Date: September 02, 2021Order Returned by Court
Date: August 20, 2021Notice Sent
Date: August 16, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: August 13, 2021Proposed Order
Date: August 12, 2021Order Returned by Court
Date: July 29, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: July 26, 2021Motion
Date: July 26, 2021Motion
Date: July 15, 2021Affidavit
Date: September 08, 2020Affidavit
Date: July 02, 2020Defendant's Original Answer
Date: May 22, 2020Certificate of Discovery, Filed
Date: July 01, 2020Motion
Date: July 01, 2020Citation Issued
Date: May 01, 2020Notice
Date: April 29, 2020Affidavit
Date: April 29, 2020Original Petition (OCA)
Date: April 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Scire Facias RETURNED RETURNED |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation Issued |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Service | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation By Certified Mail ENERGY VISION TEAM, LLC Returned Unserved 09/15/2023 Returned 09/15/2023 | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Scire Facias | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ HEIR RINCON, RAMON FRANCISCO Served 07/12/2023 Returned 07/14/2023 HEIR |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter Received TRANSMITTAL OF FEES FOR WRIT OF SCIRE FACIAS TRANSMITTAL OF FEES FOR WRIT OF SCIRE FACIAS |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR SCIRE FACIAS SUBSTITUTION FOR SCIRE FACIAS SUBSTITUTION |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Suggestion of Death | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance, Filed OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF ATTORNEY IN CHARGE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF ATTORNEY IN CHARGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.