Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Jorge Munoz, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts 389th District Court with Leticia Lopez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2024 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedApril 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Filing Court House389th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suit |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: April 08, 2024Motion for Non-Suit
Date: April 04, 2024Proposed Order
Date: March 28, 2024Writ Issued
Date: March 28, 2024Order for Non-Suit, Signed
Date: April 08, 2024Notice Sent
Date: March 28, 2024Proposed Order
Date: March 28, 2024Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: March 28, 2024Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: March 27, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Tickler (6:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Lopez, Letty) CHECK DISP CHECK DISP Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent ORDER TO NON-SUIT ORDER TO NON-SUIT Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit, Signed
Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit, Signed SIGNED BY JUDGE LETTY LOPEZ. AAG SIGNED BY JUDGE LETTY LOPEZ. AAG Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Tickler (6:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Lopez, Letty) NON SUIT OTBS NON SUIT OTBS |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion for Non-Suit
Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER TO NON-SUIT ORDER TO NON-SUIT Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order TO NON-SUIT TO NON-SUIT Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Called STATE PRESENT. DEF. PRESENT WITHOUT ATTORNEY JORGE MUNOZ. ON WRIT: NON SUIT OTBS STATE PRESENT. DEF. PRESENT WITHOUT ATTORNEY JORGE MUNOZ. ON WRIT: NON SUIT OTBS Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Lopez, Letty) SO#1348247 Result: Held SO#1348247 Judge: Lopez, Letty |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.