Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Escobedo, Ramses, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Peter Michael Zavaletta, against Kenan Transport, Llc, Petro-Chemical Transport Llc, The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc., represented by Ricardo Villanueva, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Librado Keno Vasquez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 23, 2020 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Notice Sent
Date: August 09, 2022Notice of Intent to Take Oral-Video Deposition
Date: January 27, 2022Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: February 23, 2023Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: May 13, 2022Notice of Intent to Take Oral-Video Deposition
Date: October 01, 2021Rule 203 Certification
Date: April 23, 2021Rule 203 Certification
Date: April 05, 2021Proposed Order
Date: August 05, 2022Affidavit
Date: November 30, 2021Notice Sent
Date: March 01, 2021Rule 203 Certification
Date: August 27, 2020Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: August 30, 2022Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: April 22, 2022Letter Received
Date: September 09, 2020Rule 203 Certification
Date: February 25, 2021Amended Answer
Date: April 16, 2021Motion to Quash
Date: December 07, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: January 05, 2021Rule 203 Certification
Date: April 26, 2021Proposed Order
Date: June 11, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: December 22, 2020Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: June 11, 2021Proposed Order
Date: November 20, 2020Proposed Order
Date: October 15, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: August 25, 2020Notice Sent
Date: September 01, 2020Order Returned by Court
Date: October 27, 2020Rule 203 Certification
Date: August 05, 2020Deposition
Date: October 20, 2020Citation Issued
Date: June 24, 2020Order, Signed
Date: February 26, 2021Motion
Date: May 28, 2020Proposed Order
Date: July 31, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: August 05, 2020Defendant's Original Answer
Date: July 30, 2020Officer's Certification (Deposition)
Date: September 03, 2020Civil Case Information Sheet
Date: April 23, 2020Order Setting Hearing
Date: July 30, 2020Proposed Order
Date: May 28, 2020Rule 203 Certification
Date: August 05, 2020Notice Sent
Date: August 05, 2020Proposed Order
Date: May 28, 2020Rule 203 Certification
Date: February 24, 2022Mediator's Report
Date: January 23, 2023Subpoena Issued
Date: April 12, 2022Proposed Order
Date: February 24, 2021Proposed Order
Date: September 30, 2021Notice Sent
Date: January 05, 2021Rule 11 Agreement Reviewed and Returned by Court
Date: October 15, 2020Notice Sent
Date: September 24, 2020Officer's Certification (Deposition)
Date: September 03, 2020Officer's Certification (Deposition)
Date: September 18, 2020Rule 203 Certification
Date: August 05, 2020Proposed Order
Date: August 25, 2020Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: September 22, 2020Rule 203 Certification
Date: April 01, 2021Officer's Certification (Deposition)
Date: September 03, 2020Rule 203 Certification
Date: March 12, 2021Notice Sent
Date: June 04, 2020Officer's Certification (Deposition)
Date: September 18, 2020Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: September 01, 2020Affidavit
Date: October 29, 2021Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: August 02, 2022Notice of Intent to Take Oral-Video Deposition
Date: April 05, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: July 20, 2021Certificate
Date: October 09, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: September 24, 2020Rule 203 Certification
Date: February 24, 2022Notice Sent
Date: August 03, 2022Notice Sent
Date: July 20, 2021Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: February 24, 2023Notice Sent
Date: October 01, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: July 28, 2022Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: October 01, 2021Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: October 15, 2020Notice Sent
Date: December 02, 2020Rule 203 Certification
Date: August 05, 2020Rule 203 Certification
Date: February 25, 2021Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: February 24, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: April 23, 2020Rule 11 Agreement Reviewed and Returned by Court
Date: February 24, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: July 30, 2020Proposed Order
Date: September 22, 2020Rule 203 Certification
Date: August 12, 2020Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 28, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 21, 2023Notice of Delivery
Date: November 13, 2023Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: November 03, 2023Proposed Order
Date: May 10, 2023Motion to Quash
Date: April 20, 2023Special Exceptions
Date: April 14, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: May 09, 2023Notice Sent
Date: April 28, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 28, 2023Notice Sent
Date: May 09, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: May 03, 2023Motion to Quash
Date: April 20, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: April 06, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: October 26, 2023Notice Sent
Date: June 05, 2023Proposed Order
Date: October 23, 2023Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: December 11, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: October 23, 2023Charge of the Court
Date: October 18, 2023Notice Sent
Date: November 03, 2023Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: October 23, 2023Motion
Date: October 18, 2023Notice
Date: October 18, 2023Motion
Date: October 16, 2023Notice
Date: October 18, 2023Notice Sent
Date: May 03, 2023Notice Sent
Date: April 18, 2023Motion to Quash
Date: April 18, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: May 03, 2023Motion to Quash
Date: April 20, 2023Motion to Quash
Date: April 18, 2023Notice
Date: October 18, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: May 15, 2023Motion to Quash
Date: April 26, 2023Proposed Order
Date: April 28, 2023Proposed Order
Date: June 01, 2023Motion to Quash
Date: April 20, 2023Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: April 28, 2023Motion to Quash
Date: April 20, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 14, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 18, 2023Motion to Quash
Date: October 23, 2023Motion
Date: October 16, 2023Motion
Date: October 16, 2023Notice
Date: October 23, 2023Charge of the Court
Date: October 23, 2023Notice
Date: October 18, 2023Motion
Date: October 18, 2023Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: June 02, 2023Motion
Date: October 18, 2023Notice
Date: October 18, 2023Notice
Date: October 23, 2023Witness List
Date: October 19, 2023List
Date: October 24, 2023Motion to Quash
Date: October 23, 2023Rule 203 Certification
Date: August 05, 2020Defendant's Original Answer
Date: July 02, 2020Jury Demand
Date: May 12, 2020Order Returned by Court
Date: May 29, 2020Answer
Date: May 12, 2020Citation Issued
Date: April 23, 2020Application for Subpoena
Date: April 08, 2022Amended Answer
Date: March 23, 2023Notice
Date: October 07, 2021Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: March 22, 2022Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: March 29, 2021Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: February 12, 2021Rule 203 Certification
Date: February 01, 2021Amended Petition
Date: June 22, 2020Officer's Certification (Deposition)
Date: September 10, 2020Order Setting Hearing
Date: December 22, 2020Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: August 25, 2020Rule 203 Certification
Date: August 17, 2020Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: November 30, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: June 03, 2020Rule 11 Agreement Reviewed and Returned by Court
Date: April 25, 2022Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: August 09, 2022Rule 203 Certification
Date: February 24, 2022Proposed Order
Date: June 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Preferential Trial (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno") | |
June 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Final Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno") | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Control Conference Hearing/Telephonic (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno") | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference with atty pat fossett and maricela w/ atty ricardo villanueva fpt-6/20/24 @ 8:30 a.m preferrential t/m-6/24/24 @ 8:00 a.m. 2 weeks with atty pat fossett and maricela w/ atty ricardo villanueva fpt-6/20/24 @ 8:30 a.m preferrential t/m-6/24/24 @ 8:00 a.m. 2 weeks |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions RE; ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR RE; ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Delivery RE: AMERICAN HEALTH IMAGING - MEDICAL RECORDS AND DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING RE: AMERICAN HEALTH IMAGING - MEDICAL RECORDS AND DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting DCC, Signed TELEPHONIC TELEPHONIC |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed dcc set for 12/13/23 @ 1:30 p.m. dcc set for 12/13/23 @ 1:30 p.m. |
|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Other CANCELED Jury Trial (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno") Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.