Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Daniel Mora, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts 93rd District Court with Fernando G. Mancias presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2024 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Filing Court House93rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeOther |
Notice Sent
Date: March 28, 2024Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: March 27, 2024Order of Release, Signed
Date: April 09, 2024Notice Sent to HCSO
Date: April 09, 2024Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: March 27, 2024Proposed Order
Date: March 27, 2024Writ Issued
Date: March 28, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM FORM ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM FORM Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Filed
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order of Release, Signed
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent to HCSO ORDER OF RELEASE ORDER OF RELEASE Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Mancias, Fernando G) 04/03/2024 Reset by Court to 04/08/2024 04/08/2024 Reset by Court to 04/09/2024
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Writ of Habeas Corpus (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Mancias, Fernando G) | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FOR BOND REDUCTION ORDER SETTING HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FOR BOND REDUCTION Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Writ Issued Writ Issued Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Writ BARRIENTOS, STEVEN RODRIGUEZ Served 03/28/2024 Returned 04/01/2024
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FOR BOND REDUCTION ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FOR BOND REDUCTION Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.