Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Sergio J. Sanchez, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts 430th District Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 26, 2024 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedApril 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Filing Court House430th District Court |
Writ Issued
Date: March 28, 2024Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: March 26, 2024Proposed Order
Date: March 26, 2024Order of Commitment, Signed
Date: April 04, 2024Notice Sent to HCSO
Date: April 05, 2024Notice Sent
Date: March 28, 2024Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: March 27, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent to HCSO ORDER OF COMMITMENT ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Order of Commitment, Signed | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Writ of Habeas Corpus (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Esparza, Larry) | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Entries CASE CALLED BY JUDGE ESPARZA, ATTY PRESENT FOR DEF. ANALIZ VARGAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. BOND REDUCED TO MAN DEL CSx2 $2,500C/S, MAN DEL CS PG 3/4 - $2,000 C/S AND POSS CHARGES TO $2,000 PRX2 RUAS. CASE CALLED BY JUDGE ESPARZA, ATTY PRESENT FOR DEF. ANALIZ VARGAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. BOND REDUCED TO MAN DEL CSx2 $2,500C/S, MAN DEL CS PG 3/4 - $2,000 C/S AND POSS CHARGES TO $2,000 PRX2 RUAS. |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Writ Issued Writ Issued |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ORDER SETTING HEARING |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Writ QUINTERO, FRANCISCO Returned Unserved 04/04/2024 Returned 04/04/2024 | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing, Signed | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA) | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.