Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Rubio Salinas, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts 398th District Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 26, 2024 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Filing Court House398th District Court |
Proposed Order
Date: March 26, 2024Order Returned by Court
Date: March 27, 2024Notice Sent
Date: April 02, 2024Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 02, 2024Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: March 26, 2024Order Setting Hearing
Date: March 26, 2024Writ Issued
Date: April 02, 2024Notice Sent
Date: April 02, 2024Proposed Order
Date: March 26, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Writ of Habeas Corpus (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Esparza, Larry) | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION ORDER SETTING HEARING ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed ORDER SETTING HEARING ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION ORDER SETTING HEARING ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Writ Issued Writ Issued |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent OSH ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION OSH ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Writ GONZALEZ, NORBERTO DAMIAN Served 04/04/2024 Returned 04/10/2024 | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Writ GONZALEZ, NORBERTO DAMIAN Served 04/04/2024 | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER ON DEFENDANTS RELEASE FOR LACK OF PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER ON DEFENDANTS RELEASE FOR LACK OF PROBABLE CAUSE |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.