Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Sally Middleton Connet, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts 93rd District Court with Fernando G. Mancias presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2024 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Filing Court House93rd District Court |
Notice Sent
Date: March 11, 2024Proposed Order
Date: March 11, 2024Notice Sent to HCSO
Date: March 19, 2024Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: March 11, 2024Order of Commitment, Signed
Date: March 19, 2024Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: March 11, 2024Writ Issued
Date: March 11, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent to HCSO ORDER OF COMMITMENT ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Order of Commitment, Signed | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Writ of Habeas Corpus (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Mancias, Fernando G) 03/14/2024 Reset by Court to 03/19/2024 | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Writ of Habeas Corpus (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Mancias, Fernando G) | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Writ of Habeas Corpus (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Mancias, Fernando G) | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER OF SETTING ORDER OF SETTING |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing, Signed | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA) | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Writ Issued Writ Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.