Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Jesus De La Pena, Antonio Alfaro VS. Violeta Davila
An Injury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX. Judge Rose Guerra Reyna presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 28, 2019
Last Refreshed
October 11, 2023
Filing Location
Hidalgo County, TX
Category
Injury or Damage - Motor Vehicle (OCA)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Non-Suit
Status
Want of Prosecution
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Court Costs Paid
Date: Aug 10, 2022Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: Jul 25, 2022Order for Non-Suit, Signed
Date: Jul 23, 2022Court Entries
Date: Jul 21, 2022Notice of Non-Suit, Filed
Date: Jul 20, 2022Notice Sent
Date: Jul 18, 2022Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Date: Jul 15, 2022Rule 11 Agreement Reviewed and Returned by Court
Date: Jun 10, 2022Notice Sent
Date: Jun 01, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: May 31, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: May 12, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: May 12, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: May 12, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: May 12, 2022Court Entries
Date: May 12, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: May 11, 2022List
Date: May 11, 2022Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: May 11, 2022Amended
Date: May 11, 2022Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: May 11, 2022Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: May 11, 2022Amended
Date: May 11, 2022Notice of Filing of Affidavits with Exhibits
Date: May 11, 2022Court Entries
Date: May 09, 2022Notice
Date: May 06, 2022Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: Apr 25, 2022Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: Apr 22, 2022Exhibit
Date: Apr 18, 2022List
Date: Apr 18, 2022Reporters Certification of Deposition
Date: Apr 05, 2022Court Entries
Date: Mar 28, 2022Notice of Lead Counsel, Filed
Date: Mar 28, 2022Notice
Date: Mar 07, 2022Amended Answer
Date: Jan 18, 2022Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: Nov 17, 2021Notice Sent
Date: Nov 17, 2021Notice of Filing of Affidavits with Exhibits
Date: Jul 07, 2021Order, Signed
Date: Mar 03, 2021Notice Sent
Date: Mar 03, 2021Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: Oct 27, 2020Notice Sent
Date: Oct 27, 2020Court Entries
Date: Oct 15, 2020Court Entries
Date: Oct 13, 2020Court Entries
Date: Aug 26, 2020Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: Aug 11, 2020Reporters Certification of Deposition
Date: Jun 30, 2020Notice of Filing of Affidavits with Exhibits
Date: Jun 12, 2020Jury Demand
Date: Mar 10, 2020Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: Mar 06, 2020Notice Sent
Date: Mar 06, 2020Proposed Order
Date: Mar 05, 2020Reporters Certification of Deposition
Date: Feb 20, 2020Reporters Certification of Deposition
Date: Feb 20, 2020Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: Jun 21, 2019Notice Sent
Date: Jun 21, 2019Notice Sent
Date: May 29, 2019Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: May 29, 2019Answer
Date: May 03, 2019Citation Issued
Date: Mar 01, 2019Civil Case Information Sheet
Date: Feb 28, 2019Original Petition (OCA)
Date: Feb 28, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Paid
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tickler Case Disposed CANCELED Tickler (5:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Case Disposed CLERKS TO DISPOSE CASE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing (JP-OCA) Case Disposed CANCELED Show Cause Hearing (JP-OCA) (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Case Disposed DISPOSING DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED 06/16/2022 Reset by Court to 07/20/2022 07/20/2022 Reset by Court to 07/25/2022 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit, Signed
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed ORDER OF NONSUIT; SENT TO D/C QUEUE ON 7/25/22 ORDER OF NONSUIT; SENT TO D/C QUEUE ON 7/25/22 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Email sent to attorney(s) with link to appear via Zoom on 7/25/22 Email sent to attorney(s) with link to appear via Zoom on 7/25/22 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit, Filed WITH PREJUDICE WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER OF NON-SUIT ORDER OF NON-SUIT Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER RESETTING SHOW CAUSE HEARING - VIA ZOOM ORDER RESETTING SHOW CAUSE HEARING - VIA ZOOM Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed SHOW CAUSE SHOW CAUSE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER RESETTING SHOW CAUSE HEARING ORDER RESETTING SHOW CAUSE HEARING Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed Order resetting Show cause hearing from 7/20/22 at 8:00 a.m. to 7/25/22 at 8:00 a.m. - sent to DC queue on 7/15/22 Order resetting Show cause hearing from 7/20/22 at 8:00 a.m. to 7/25/22 at 8:00 a.m. - sent to DC queue on 7/15/22 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order RESETTING SHOW CAUSE HEARING RESETTING SHOW CAUSE HEARING Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing (JP-OCA) (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) DISPOSING DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED DISPOSING DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED |
|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement Reviewed and Returned by Court
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue RULE 11 AGREEMENT RULE 11 AGREEMENT Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Phone Call RECEIVED FROM RASHIDA/PLFS ATTY TO REQ. ADDITIONAL TIME TO FILE THE DISP. DOCUMENTS DUE TO NEEDING TO OBTAIN THE SIGNAURE OF ONE OF THEIR CLIENTS WHO IS IN THE NURSING HOME; COURT ADVISED ADVISED THE SHOW CAUSE HRG. MAY BE R/S TO 7/20/22 AT 8:00 A.M HOWEVER A RULE 11 AGREEMENT MUST BE FILED AND TO PLZ CONTACT THE COURT ONCE THE L LETTER HAS BEEN FILED RECEIVED FROM RASHIDA/PLFS ATTY TO REQ. ADDITIONAL TIME TO FILE THE DISP. DOCUMENTS DUE TO NEEDING TO OBTAIN THE SIGNAURE OF ONE OF THEIR CLIENTS WHO IS IN THE NURSING HOME; COURT ADVISED ADVISED THE SHOW CAUSE HRG. MAY BE R/S TO 7/20/22 AT 8:00 A.M HOWEVER A RULE 11 AGREEMENT MUST BE FILED AND TO PLZ CONTACT THE COURT ONCE THE L LETTER HAS BEEN FILED Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING SHOW CAUSE HEARING ??? VIA ZOOM ORDER SETTING SHOW CAUSE HEARING ??? VIA ZOOM Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed SHOW CAUSE HEARING VIA ZOOM SHOW CAUSE HEARING VIA ZOOM Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tickler (5:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) DISPOSING DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED DISPOSING DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed ORDER SETTING SHOW CAUSE HEARING FOR 6/16/22 AT 8:00 A.M.; SENT TO D/C QUEUE ORDER SETTING SHOW CAUSE HEARING FOR 6/16/22 AT 8:00 A.M.; SENT TO D/C QUEUE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER SETTING HEARING SHOW CAUSE VIA ZOOM ORDER SETTING HEARING SHOW CAUSE VIA ZOOM Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing SHOW CAUSE VIA ZOOM SHOW CAUSE VIA ZOOM Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court RULE 11 RULE 11 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial on Merits Other CANCELED Trial on Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Other 2-3 days Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial on Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) 2-3 days 2-3 days |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED CHARGE OF THE COURT PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED CHARGE OF THE COURT Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court DEFENDANT VIOLETA DAVILA'S PROPOSED CHARGE DEFENDANT VIOLETA DAVILA'S PROPOSED CHARGE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Email sent to attorney(s) with link to appear via Zoom on Monday 5-16-22 Email sent to attorney(s) with link to appear via Zoom on Monday 5-16-22 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Entries CASE CALLED FOR FINAL P/T; ATTY. SONIA CERDA PRESNET VIA ZOOM; ATTY. LAUREN ROBERTS PRESENT VIA ZOOM; COUNSEL ADVISED THAT THERE WAS A SETTLEMENT, AND EACH PLAINTIFF RECEIVED THE MAXIMUM OF THE INSURANCE POLICY; THE COURT ORDER THAT DISPOSING DOCUMENTS BE FILED BY 5/26/22 AT 9 A.M. CASE CALLED FOR FINAL P/T; ATTY. SONIA CERDA PRESNET VIA ZOOM; ATTY. LAUREN ROBERTS PRESENT VIA ZOOM; COUNSEL ADVISED THAT THERE WAS A SETTLEMENT, AND EACH PLAINTIFF RECEIVED THE MAXIMUM OF THE INSURANCE POLICY; THE COURT ORDER THAT DISPOSING DOCUMENTS BE FILED BY 5/26/22 AT 9 A.M. Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.)
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue DEFENDANT VIOLETA DAVILA'S PROPOSED CHARGE DEFENDANT VIOLETA DAVILA'S PROPOSED CHARGE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED CHARGE OF THE COURT PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED CHARGE OF THE COURT Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE COUNTERAFFIDAVITS AND EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF JACOB WEINBERG, M.D ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE COUNTERAFFIDAVITS AND EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF JACOB WEINBERG, M.D Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike PLAINTIFFS', JESUS DE LA PENA AND ANTONIO ALFARO, COUTNERAFFIDAVITS AND EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF JACOB WEINBERG, M.D. PLAINTIFFS', JESUS DE LA PENA AND ANTONIO ALFARO, COUTNERAFFIDAVITS AND EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF JACOB WEINBERG, M.D. Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
List PLAINTIFFS' WITNESS LIST PLAINTIFFS' WITNESS LIST Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine, Filed
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED WITNESS LIST PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED WITNESS LIST Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed EXCERPTS FROM THE DEPOSTION OF BRIAN SCHTUPAK, DC EXCERPTS FROM THE DEPOSTION OF BRIAN SCHTUPAK, DC Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine, Filed WITH INCORPORATED ORDER WITH INCORPORATED ORDER Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended DEFENDANT VIOLETA DAVILA'S AMENDED WITNESS LIST DEFENDANT VIOLETA DAVILA'S AMENDED WITNESS LIST Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Affidavits with Exhibits COTROVERTING COTROVERTING Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE COUNTERAFFIDAVITS AND EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF JACOB WEINBERG, M.D GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE COUNTERAFFIDAVITS AND EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF JACOB WEINBERG, M.D Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED CHARGE OF THE COURT PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED CHARGE OF THE COURT Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order DEFENDANT VIOLETA DAVILA'S PROPOSED CHARGE DEFENDANT VIOLETA DAVILA'S PROPOSED CHARGE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Email sent to attorney(s) with link to appear via Zoom on 5/12/22 Email sent to attorney(s) with link to appear via Zoom on 5/12/22 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice DEFENDANT'S EXPERT DISCLOSURES WITH EXHIBITS ATTACHED DEFENDANT'S EXPERT DISCLOSURES WITH EXHIBITS ATTACHED Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed AFFIDAVITS PURSUANT RULE 902(10) OF THE TEXAS RULES OF EVIDENCE AND 18.001 ET SEQ. OF THE TEXAS CIVIL PRACTICE AND REMEDIES CODE AFFIDAVITS PURSUANT RULE 902(10) OF THE TEXAS RULES OF EVIDENCE AND 18.001 ET SEQ. OF THE TEXAS CIVIL PRACTICE AND REMEDIES CODE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed WITH AFFIDAVIT WITH AFFIDAVIT Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit DEFENDANT VIOLETA DAVILA'S LIST DEFENDANT VIOLETA DAVILA'S LIST Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
List DEFENDANT VIOLETA DAVILA'S WITNESS DEFENDANT VIOLETA DAVILA'S WITNESS Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition DR. BRIAN SCHTUPAK DR. BRIAN SCHTUPAK Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Entries CASE CALLED FOR FIRST P/T; NO ONE PRESENT; COUNSEL HAD AGREED TO PASS FIRST P/T CASE CALLED FOR FIRST P/T; NO ONE PRESENT; COUNSEL HAD AGREED TO PASS FIRST P/T Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
First Pretrial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.)
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Phone Call RECEIVED FROM KIMBERLY REP. DEFT. TO ADVISE HAS SPOKE WITH OPP. COUNSEL AND BOTH ATTYS. IN AGREEMENT TO PASS THE 1ST PRE-TRIAL HRG. SET ON 3/31/22 RECEIVED FROM KIMBERLY REP. DEFT. TO ADVISE HAS SPOKE WITH OPP. COUNSEL AND BOTH ATTYS. IN AGREEMENT TO PASS THE 1ST PRE-TRIAL HRG. SET ON 3/31/22 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Email sent to attorney(s) with link to appear via Zoom on 3/31/22 Email sent to attorney(s) with link to appear via Zoom on 3/31/22 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lead Counsel, Filed
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice PLAINTIFF S EXPERT DISCLORUES PLAINTIFF S EXPERT DISCLORUES Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer FIRST FIRST Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order, Signed
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent DOCKET CONTROL ORDER DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order, Signed Sent to DC queue on 11/17/21 Sent to DC queue on 11/17/21 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue DOCKET CONTROL ORDER DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order DOCKET CONTROL ORDER DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Affidavits with Exhibits PLAINTIFFS' FOURTH NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS PURSUANT RULE 902(10) OF THE TEXAS RULES OF EVIDENCE AND 18.001 ET SEQ. OF THE TEXAS CIVIL PRACTICE AND REMEDIES CODE PLAINTIFFS' FOURTH NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS PURSUANT RULE 902(10) OF THE TEXAS RULES OF EVIDENCE AND 18.001 ET SEQ. OF THE TEXAS CIVIL PRACTICE AND REMEDIES CODE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial on Merits Other CANCELED Trial on Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Other 2-3 day jury trial Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial on Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) 2-3 day jury trial 2-3 day jury trial |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Pre-Trial Hearing Other CANCELED Final Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Other Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference HELD WITH JEREMY/ATTY. ERIC NIELSON AND ATTY. JOHN SCHULTZ FOR ATTY. JESSE HERNANDEZ AND IN AGREEMENT TO SET CASE FOR JURY TRIAL ON 5/16/22 AT 9:00 A.M.; FPT - 5/12/22 AT 8:30 A.M AND FIRST PRE-TRIAL HRG. ON 3/31/22 AT 8:30 A.M. (2-3 DAYS) HELD WITH JEREMY/ATTY. ERIC NIELSON AND ATTY. JOHN SCHULTZ FOR ATTY. JESSE HERNANDEZ AND IN AGREEMENT TO SET CASE FOR JURY TRIAL ON 5/16/22 AT 9:00 A.M.; FPT - 5/12/22 AT 8:30 A.M AND FIRST PRE-TRIAL HRG. ON 3/31/22 AT 8:30 A.M. (2-3 DAYS) Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference Hearing/Telephonic (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.)
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
First Pretrial Other CANCELED First Pretrial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Other Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | First Pretrial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed ORDER CANCELING THE CURRENT FIRST PRE-TRIAL HEARING, FINAL PRE-TRIAL HEARING, AND TRIAL SETTING AND SETTING A TELEPHONIC DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE ORDER CANCELING THE CURRENT FIRST PRE-TRIAL HEARING, FINAL PRE-TRIAL HEARING, AND TRIAL SETTING AND SETTING A TELEPHONIC DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER CANCELING AND SETTTING A TELEPHONIC DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE ORDER CANCELING AND SETTTING A TELEPHONIC DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed ORDER CANCELLING THE CURRENT 1ST PRE-TRIAL HRG; FPT, TM AND SETTING DCC ON 5/26/21 AT 2:00 P.M - SENT TO DISTRICT CLERK ON 3/3/21 ORDER CANCELLING THE CURRENT 1ST PRE-TRIAL HRG; FPT, TM AND SETTING DCC ON 5/26/21 AT 2:00 P.M - SENT TO DISTRICT CLERK ON 3/3/21 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER CANCELING AND SETTING ORDER CANCELING AND SETTING Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER CANCELLING AND SETTING ORDER CANCELLING AND SETTING Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order, Signed
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent DOCKET CONTROL ORDER DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order, Signed Sent to DC queue on 10/27/2020 Sent to DC queue on 10/27/2020 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order DOCKET CONTROL ORDER DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference Jeremy w/Atty. Eric Nielsen; He stated that he had called opposing counsel to his cell phone and it went straight to voicemail and he was not allowed to leave a voicemail; He stated he called the office line and there was no answer; He wished to proceed with the DCC, and stated if opposing counsel called back that he would call back to conduct a new dcc; Parties agreed to set case for a First P/T on 4/15/21 at 8:30 a.m., Final P/T on 6/3/21 at 8:30 a.m. and T/M on 6/7/21 at 9:00 a.m.; Mediation is mandatory and needs to be done 30 days before trial; 1 Joint P/T Order must be filed before the Final P/T; This will be a 2-3 day Jury Trial; Jeremy was advised that the DCO would be filed at 2:30 p.m on 10/26/20 in case parties called back to conduct a dcc. Jeremy w/Atty. Eric Nielsen; He stated that he had called opposing counsel to his cell phone and it went straight to voicemail and he was not allowed to leave a voicemail; He stated he called the office line and there was no answer; He wished to proceed with the DCC, and stated if opposing counsel called back that he would call back to conduct a new dcc; Parties agreed to set case for a First P/T on 4/15/21 at 8:30 a.m., Final P/T on 6/3/21 at 8:30 a.m. and T/M on 6/7/21 at 9:00 a.m.; Mediation is mandatory and needs to be done 30 days before trial; 1 Joint P/T Order must be filed before the Final P/T; This will be a 2-3 day Jury Trial; Jeremy was advised that the DCO would be filed at 2:30 p.m on 10/26/20 in case parties called back to conduct a dcc. Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue DOCKET CONTROL ORDER DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference Hearing/Telephonic (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.)
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Trial on Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) 2-3 DAY JURY TRIAL 2-3 DAY JURY TRIAL Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Entries CASE CALLED FOR T/M; ATTY. DANIEL CIENFUEGOS PRESENT VIA ZOOM; ATTY. JESUS HERNANDEZ PRESENT VIA ZOOM; THE COURT ORDERED THAT GIL PERALEZ MEDIATED THE CASE AT THE AGREED DATE AND TIME BY COUNSEL; CASE SET FOR DCC FOR 10/26/20 AT 1:30 P.M.; ATTY. CIENFUEGO TO INITIATE THE TELEPHONIC DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE CALL. CASE CALLED FOR T/M; ATTY. DANIEL CIENFUEGOS PRESENT VIA ZOOM; ATTY. JESUS HERNANDEZ PRESENT VIA ZOOM; THE COURT ORDERED THAT GIL PERALEZ MEDIATED THE CASE AT THE AGREED DATE AND TIME BY COUNSEL; CASE SET FOR DCC FOR 10/26/20 AT 1:30 P.M.; ATTY. CIENFUEGO TO INITIATE THE TELEPHONIC DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE CALL. Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Email sent to attorneys with link to appear via Zoom on 10/19/2020 Email sent to attorneys with link to appear via Zoom on 10/19/2020 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.)
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Entries CASE CALLED FOR FINAL PRE-TRIAL HRG; ATTY. JESSE HERNANDEZ APPEARED VIA ZOOM AND ADVISED THE CASE HAS NOT BEEN MEDIATED; (DOCKET CONTROL ORDER WAS EMAILED TO ATTY. ERIC NELSON BY THE DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE ON 3/6/20 AND THE EMAIL NOTICE WAS OPENED); COURT SHALL KEEP THE CASE SET ON Monday'S DOCKET; IF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF DOES NOT APPEAR, THE COURT WILL TAKE ANNOUNCEMENTS BY ATTY. JESSE HERNANDEZ; IF OPP. COUNSEL DOES APPEAR, THE COURT WILL ADDRESS THE DCO AT THAT TIME; COURT NOTED THAT A JURY TRIAL WAS REQUESTED; COURT ADVISED MR. HERNANDEZ THERE ARE NO PANELS AVAILABLE THIS MONTH CASE CALLED FOR FINAL PRE-TRIAL HRG; ATTY. JESSE HERNANDEZ APPEARED VIA ZOOM AND ADVISED THE CASE HAS NOT BEEN MEDIATED; (DOCKET CONTROL ORDER WAS EMAILED TO ATTY. ERIC NELSON BY THE DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE ON 3/6/20 AND THE EMAIL NOTICE WAS OPENED); COURT SHALL KEEP THE CASE SET ON Monday'S DOCKET; IF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF DOES NOT APPEAR, THE COURT WILL TAKE ANNOUNCEMENTS BY ATTY. JESSE HERNANDEZ; IF OPP. COUNSEL DOES APPEAR, THE COURT WILL ADDRESS THE DCO AT THAT TIME; COURT NOTED THAT A JURY TRIAL WAS REQUESTED; COURT ADVISED MR. HERNANDEZ THERE ARE NO PANELS AVAILABLE THIS MONTH Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Email sent to attorneys with link to appear via Zoom on 10/15/2020 Email sent to attorneys with link to appear via Zoom on 10/15/2020 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
First Pretrial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.)
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Entries COURT STAFF CALLED CASE FOR FIRST PRE-TRIAL VIA ZOOM; ATTY. DANIEL CIENFUEGO ZOOMED IN AND ADVISED NTPT; OPP. COUNSEL DID NOT APPEAR COURT STAFF CALLED CASE FOR FIRST PRE-TRIAL VIA ZOOM; ATTY. DANIEL CIENFUEGO ZOOMED IN AND ADVISED NTPT; OPP. COUNSEL DID NOT APPEAR Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Email sent to attorneys with link to appear via Zoom on 8/27/2020 Email sent to attorneys with link to appear via Zoom on 8/27/2020 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed PLAINTIFFS' SECOND NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS PURSUANT RULE 902(10) OF THE TEXAS RULES OF EVIDENCE AND 18.001 ET SEQ. OF THE TEXAS CIVIL PRACTICE AND REMEDIES CODE WITH AFFIDAVITS ATTACHED PLAINTIFFS' SECOND NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS PURSUANT RULE 902(10) OF THE TEXAS RULES OF EVIDENCE AND 18.001 ET SEQ. OF THE TEXAS CIVIL PRACTICE AND REMEDIES CODE WITH AFFIDAVITS ATTACHED Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition VIOLETA DAVILA VIOLETA DAVILA Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Affidavits with Exhibits PURSUANT RULE 902(10) OF THE TEXAS RULES OF EVIDENCE AND 18.001 ET SEQ. OF THE TEXAS CIVIL PRACTICE AND REMEDIES CODE PURSUANT RULE 902(10) OF THE TEXAS RULES OF EVIDENCE AND 18.001 ET SEQ. OF THE TEXAS CIVIL PRACTICE AND REMEDIES CODE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Demand
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Trial on Merits Other CANCELED Trial on Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Other 2-3 DAY JURY TRIAL Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order, Signed
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order, Signed Sent to DC queue on 3/6/2020 Sent to DC queue on 3/6/2020 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order DOCKET CONTROL ORDER DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue DOCKET CONTROL ORDER DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Entries CASE CALLED FOR FINAL P/T; ATTY. JESUS HERNANDEZ PRESENT; COUNSEL ANNOUNCED NOT READY FOR TRIAL; CASE HAS NOT BEEN MEDIATED; COUNSEL URGED A MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ON THE BASIS TO BE ABLE TO MEDIATE THE CASE; THE COURT GRANTED THE ORAL MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE; CASE TO BE RESET FOR A DCC FOR 3/5/20 AT 3:00 P.M. CASE CALLED FOR FINAL P/T; ATTY. JESUS HERNANDEZ PRESENT; COUNSEL ANNOUNCED NOT READY FOR TRIAL; CASE HAS NOT BEEN MEDIATED; COUNSEL URGED A MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ON THE BASIS TO BE ABLE TO MEDIATE THE CASE; THE COURT GRANTED THE ORAL MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE; CASE TO BE RESET FOR A DCC FOR 3/5/20 AT 3:00 P.M. Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference Hearing/Telephonic (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.)
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference Jeremy w/Atty. Eric Nielsen and Sylva w/ Atty. Jesus Hernandez; Court staff was informed that all parties who need to participate on DCC are on the phone; Parties agreed to set case for a First P/T on 8/27/20 at 8:30 a.m., Final P/T on 10/15/20 at 8:30 a.m. and T/M on 10/19/20 at 9:00 a.m.; Mediation is mandatory and needs to be done 30 days before trial; 1 Joint P/T Order must be filed before the Final P/T; This will be a 2-3 day Jury Trial Jeremy w/Atty. Eric Nielsen and Sylva w/ Atty. Jesus Hernandez; Court staff was informed that all parties who need to participate on DCC are on the phone; Parties agreed to set case for a First P/T on 8/27/20 at 8:30 a.m., Final P/T on 10/15/20 at 8:30 a.m. and T/M on 10/19/20 at 9:00 a.m.; Mediation is mandatory and needs to be done 30 days before trial; 1 Joint P/T Order must be filed before the Final P/T; This will be a 2-3 day Jury Trial Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.)
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition OF ANTONIO ALFARO TAKEN JANUARY 10, 2020 OF ANTONIO ALFARO TAKEN JANUARY 10, 2020 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition OF JESUS DE LA PENA TAKEN JANUARY 10, 2020 OF JESUS DE LA PENA TAKEN JANUARY 10, 2020 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
First Pretrial Attorney Agreement CANCELED First Pretrial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Attorney Agreement Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Phone Call FROM ATTY. JESUS HERNANDEZ; HE STATED THAT HE HAD NOTHING TO PRETY ON 1/16/20; HE IS GOING TO CALL OPPOSING COUNSEL TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO CALL TO MAKE SAME ANNOUNCEMENT. FROM ATTY. JESUS HERNANDEZ; HE STATED THAT HE HAD NOTHING TO PRETY ON 1/16/20; HE IS GOING TO CALL OPPOSING COUNSEL TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO CALL TO MAKE SAME ANNOUNCEMENT. Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Phone Call FROM JEREMY WITH ATTY. ERIC NIELSON CALLED; HE STATED THAT THERE WAS NOTHING TO PRETRY. FROM JEREMY WITH ATTY. ERIC NIELSON CALLED; HE STATED THAT THERE WAS NOTHING TO PRETRY. Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order, Signed
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent DOCKET CONTROL ORDER DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed DOCKET CONTROL ORDER SETTING FIRST P/T ON 1/16/20 AT 8:30 A.M., FINAL P/T ON 3/5/20 AT 8:30 A.M., AND T/M ON 3/9/20 AT 9:00 A.M.; SENT TO D/C QUEUE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER SETTING FIRST P/T ON 1/16/20 AT 8:30 A.M., FINAL P/T ON 3/5/20 AT 8:30 A.M., AND T/M ON 3/9/20 AT 9:00 A.M.; SENT TO D/C QUEUE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference Jeremy w/Atty. Eric Nielsen and Sylvia w/Atty. Jesus Hernandez; Court staff was informed that all parties who need to participate on DCC are on the phone; Parties agreed to set case for a First P/T on 1/16/20 at 8:30 a.m., Final P/T on 3/5/20 at 8:30 a.m. and T/M on 3/9/20 at 9:00 a.m.; Mediation is mandatory and needs to be done 30 days before trial; 1 Joint P/T Order must be filed before the Final P/T; This will be a 2-3 day Jury Trial Jeremy w/Atty. Eric Nielsen and Sylvia w/Atty. Jesus Hernandez; Court staff was informed that all parties who need to participate on DCC are on the phone; Parties agreed to set case for a First P/T on 1/16/20 at 8:30 a.m., Final P/T on 3/5/20 at 8:30 a.m. and T/M on 3/9/20 at 9:00 a.m.; Mediation is mandatory and needs to be done 30 days before trial; 1 Joint P/T Order must be filed before the Final P/T; This will be a 2-3 day Jury Trial Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference Hearing/Telephonic (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.)
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Tickler Other CANCELED Tickler (5:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Other REVIEW FILE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING TELEPHONC DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE ORDER SETTING TELEPHONC DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting DCC, Signed TELEPHONIC TELEPHONIC Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed DCC set for June 20, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. - sent to DC queue on 5/29/19 DCC set for June 20, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. - sent to DC queue on 5/29/19 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation Issued Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Davila, Violeta Served 04/10/2019 Returned 04/16/2019
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |