Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Samuel Reyes, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Ramirez, Mario E., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2019 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Cost Waived HABEAS CORPUS HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr. |
|
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ON APPLICATION FOR ON APPLICATION FOR Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr. |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed SAMUEL REYES - $322.50 SAMUEL REYES - $322.50 Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr. |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Dispositive Order Signed
Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr. |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr. |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed DISP. DISP. Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr. |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER ORDER Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr. |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Unserved
Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr. |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) **JAIL** SO#1308815 DOB: 11/30/1992 Result: Dismissed **JAIL** SO#1308815 DOB: 11/30/1992 Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr. |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ Issued Writ Issued Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.