Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Ramirez, Benito, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Efrain Molina, Jr., against Benitez, Juan, Goodleap, Llc, Nivo, Llc, represented by Jesus R. Canales, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts 398th District Court with Librado Keno Vasquez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2024 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt (Oca) |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House398th District Court |
This legal document is a complaint filed by Benito Ramirez against Goodleap, LLC, NIVO, LLC, and Juan Benitez. The plaintiff seeks monetary and non-monetary relief, alleging false representations and breach of contract regarding the installation of s...
Order Granting Motion for Substituted Service, Signed
Date: April 11, 2024Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 08, 2024Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: March 08, 2024Citation Issued
Date: February 05, 2024Motion for Substitute Service, Filed
Date: April 08, 2024Original Petition (OCA)
Date: February 02, 2024Response
Date: April 08, 2024Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: March 11, 2024Proposed Order
Date: April 08, 2024Notice Sent
Date: April 11, 2024Notice Sent
Date: March 11, 2024Proposed Order
Date: April 08, 2024Defendant's Original Answer
Date: March 08, 2024Order Setting Hearing
Date: March 08, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion for Substituted Service, Signed | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Special Exceptions (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno") (Defs.) (Defs.) |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Called atty efrain molina, atty cesar de leon present. attys withdrew special exceptions atty efrain molina, atty cesar de leon present. attys withdrew special exceptions |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing ON MOTON FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON MOTON FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion for Substitute Service, Filed | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION Response RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ON MOTON FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON MOTON FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.