Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ayad, Ind.; & On Behalf Of Estate Of Ahm, Isra, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Don Crook, against Contreras, Jose Dejesus, Royal Freight, L.P., Royal Freight, L.P. Inc., Royal Freight, L.P., Inc., represented by Regina Regi Richardson, Robert A. Valadez, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Ramirez, Joe presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Notice Sent
Date: March 08, 2022Citation Issued
Date: January 25, 2021Notice of Lead Counsel, Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: June 11, 2021Motion to Quash
Date: April 25, 2022Rule 203 Certification
Date: May 25, 2022Notice Sent
Date: April 28, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: January 20, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 28, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: May 25, 2022Request
Date: May 12, 2022Defendant's Original Answer
Date: February 22, 2021Notice Sent
Date: June 11, 2021Officer's Certification (Deposition)
Date: March 09, 2022Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: April 18, 2022Notice
Date: May 12, 2022Jury Demand
Date: February 22, 2021Designation of Experts
Date: November 29, 2021Notice
Date: May 12, 2022Notice Sent
Date: May 30, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: May 30, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: April 20, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: April 19, 2023Amended
Date: April 14, 2023Amended
Date: April 14, 2023Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: April 11, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: April 19, 2023Notice Sent
Date: April 11, 2023Charge of the Court
Date: April 10, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: April 10, 2023Notice Sent
Date: April 06, 2023Notice Sent
Date: April 06, 2023Order Signed
Date: April 06, 2023Motion for Bifurcated Trial, Filed
Date: April 06, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: April 06, 2023Order Signed
Date: April 06, 2023Charge of the Court
Date: April 04, 2023Supplemental
Date: April 04, 2023Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: April 04, 2023List
Date: April 03, 2023Charge of the Court
Date: April 03, 2023Deposition
Date: April 03, 2023Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: April 03, 2023Supplemental
Date: April 03, 2023Supplemental
Date: March 31, 2023Proposed Order
Date: March 31, 2023Motion
Date: March 31, 2023Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: March 31, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: March 30, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: March 30, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: March 30, 2023Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: March 29, 2023Letter Received
Date: March 28, 2023Letter Received
Date: March 28, 2023Notice Sent
Date: March 28, 2023Notice Sent
Date: March 28, 2023Notice Sent
Date: March 28, 2023Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: March 27, 2023Order Signed
Date: March 27, 2023Order Signed
Date: March 27, 2023Order Signed
Date: March 27, 2023Notice
Date: March 24, 2023Exhibit
Date: March 23, 2023Supplemental
Date: March 23, 2023Proposed Order
Date: March 22, 2023Proposed Order
Date: March 22, 2023Proposed Order
Date: March 22, 2023Proposed Order
Date: March 22, 2023Objection
Date: March 21, 2023Supplemental
Date: March 21, 2023Response
Date: March 17, 2023Notice
Date: March 20, 2023Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: March 17, 2023Supplemental
Date: March 20, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: March 14, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: March 14, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: March 14, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: March 14, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: March 14, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: March 14, 2023Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: March 08, 2023Supplemental
Date: February 23, 2023Motion
Date: February 23, 2023Notice
Date: February 22, 2023Motion
Date: February 22, 2023Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: February 21, 2023Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: February 17, 2023Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: February 21, 2023Final Judgment, Signed
Date: February 16, 2023Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem, Signed
Date: February 14, 2023Notice Sent
Date: February 14, 2023Notice of Co-Counsel, Filed
Date: February 13, 2023Response
Date: February 14, 2023Response
Date: February 09, 2023Notice
Date: February 13, 2023Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: February 10, 2023Response
Date: February 09, 2023Response
Date: February 08, 2023Response
Date: February 08, 2023Reply
Date: February 08, 2023Response
Date: February 07, 2023Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: February 07, 2023Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 03, 2023Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: February 03, 2023Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: February 03, 2023Reply
Date: February 03, 2023Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Date: February 01, 2023Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: February 01, 2023Amended Answer
Date: February 01, 2023Notice Sent
Date: February 02, 2023Notice
Date: January 27, 2023Notice
Date: January 27, 2023Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: January 30, 2023Notice Sent
Date: January 27, 2023Notice Sent
Date: January 27, 2023Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: January 25, 2023Notice Sent
Date: January 24, 2023Supplemental
Date: January 24, 2023Response
Date: January 25, 2023Mediator's Report
Date: January 23, 2023Response
Date: January 23, 2023Rule 203 Certification
Date: January 23, 2023Motion
Date: January 20, 2023Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: January 17, 2023Motion
Date: January 20, 2023Motion
Date: January 20, 2023Motion
Date: January 20, 2023Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: January 18, 2023Response
Date: January 12, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: January 13, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: January 11, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: January 10, 2023Motion for No Evidence Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: January 10, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: January 10, 2023Response
Date: January 06, 2023Motion for Sanctions
Date: January 10, 2023Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys
Date: January 06, 2023Notice of Intent to Take Oral-Video Deposition
Date: December 28, 2022Rule 11 Agreement Reviewed and Returned by Court
Date: December 27, 2022Notice Sent
Date: December 27, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: December 27, 2022Request
Date: December 22, 2022Answer
Date: December 20, 2022Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: December 20, 2022Amended Petition
Date: December 19, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: December 16, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: December 16, 2022Defendant's Original Answer
Date: December 16, 2022Notice Sent
Date: December 14, 2022Notice Sent
Date: December 14, 2022Notice Sent
Date: December 14, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: December 14, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: December 14, 2022Amended
Date: December 12, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: December 14, 2022Notice of Intent to Take Oral-Video Deposition
Date: December 06, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: December 06, 2022Notice of Intent to Take Oral-Video Deposition
Date: December 06, 2022Response
Date: December 05, 2022Notice of Intent to Take Oral-Video Deposition
Date: December 06, 2022Objection
Date: December 06, 2022Motion
Date: December 05, 2022Designation
Date: December 05, 2022Notice
Date: December 02, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: December 01, 2022Motion
Date: December 01, 2022Notice of Intent to Take Oral-Video Deposition
Date: November 21, 2022Motion
Date: December 01, 2022Motion
Date: December 01, 2022Amended Answer
Date: November 09, 2022Defendant's Original Answer
Date: September 30, 2022Amended Answer
Date: November 10, 2022Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: October 13, 2022Notice Sent
Date: September 23, 2022Agreed Order, Signed
Date: September 22, 2022Citation Issued
Date: August 24, 2022Request for Service
Date: August 24, 2022Third Party Action (Fee)
Date: August 01, 2022Third Party Action (Fee)
Date: July 29, 2022Notice Sent
Date: July 19, 2022Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: July 18, 2022Notice Sent
Date: June 28, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: June 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Friendly Suit (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Joe)
Judge: Ramirez, Joe) Party(RODRIGUEZ, FRANCISCO BANDA |
|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTTING FRIENDLY SUIT HEARING ORDER SETTTING FRIENDLY SUIT HEARING Judge: Ramirez, Joe) Party(RODRIGUEZ, FRANCISCO BANDA |
|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Judge: Ramirez, Joe) Party(RODRIGUEZ, FRANCISCO BANDA |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Ramirez, Joe) Party(RODRIGUEZ, FRANCISCO BANDA |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER SETTING HEARING ORDER SETTING HEARING Judge: Ramirez, Joe) Party(RODRIGUEZ, FRANCISCO BANDA |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ORDER DENYING, IN PART, PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO THE OPINIONS, REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF DR. IVAN MELENDEZ ORDER DENYING, IN PART, PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO THE OPINIONS, REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF DR. IVAN MELENDEZ Judge: Ramirez, Joe) Party(RODRIGUEZ, FRANCISCO BANDA |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER SANCTIONS ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER SANCTIONS Judge: Ramirez, Joe) Party(RODRIGUEZ, FRANCISCO BANDA |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DEFENSE RETAINED EXPERT IVAN MELENDEZ ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DEFENSE RETAINED EXPERT IVAN MELENDEZ Judge: Ramirez, Joe) Party(RODRIGUEZ, FRANCISCO BANDA |
|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Joe) Jury Selection 04/17/2023 Reset by Court to 04/17/2023 Jury Selection Judge: Ramirez, Joe) Party(RODRIGUEZ, FRANCISCO BANDA |
|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Joe) 04/17/2023 Reset by Court to 04/17/2023
Judge: Ramirez, Joe) Party(RODRIGUEZ, FRANCISCO BANDA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.