Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Blain, Paula Jo, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Rojelio Garza, against Brinker Texas, Inc., represented by Elizabeth Sandoval Cantu, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts 139th District Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2023 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other (Oca) |
Last RefreshedApril 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House139th District Court |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: July 27, 2023Notice of Filing of Medical Records
Date: April 10, 2023Rule 11 Agreement Reviewed and Returned by Court
Date: December 12, 2023Rule 11 Agreement Reviewed and Returned by Court
Date: December 06, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: March 30, 2023Corrected File Stamp Date as per Statewide e-Filing Rules
Date: January 03, 2024Agreed Scheduling Order, Signed
Date: May 15, 2023Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: December 06, 2023Order for Continuance, Signed
Date: December 08, 2023Proposed Order
Date: December 06, 2023Objection
Date: April 12, 2024Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: April 15, 2024Notice of Filing of Medical Records
Date: April 28, 2023Defendant's Original Answer
Date: February 06, 2023Answer
Date: April 21, 2023Proposed Order
Date: December 07, 2023Notice of Filing of Medical Records
Date: April 25, 2023Notice Sent
Date: November 28, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: November 22, 2023Notice Sent
Date: November 21, 2023Designation of Experts
Date: November 21, 2023Motion
Date: November 22, 2023Amended Answer
Date: March 07, 2023Proposed Order
Date: March 27, 2024Proposed Order
Date: March 28, 2023Proposed Order
Date: February 22, 2024Notice of Filing of Medical Records
Date: April 17, 2023Proposed Order
Date: November 22, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: July 26, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: February 23, 2024Proposed Order
Date: August 11, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: November 20, 2023Notice Sent
Date: May 15, 2023Motion to Enforce
Date: November 20, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: February 22, 2024Order Returned by Court
Date: April 15, 2024Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: November 27, 2023Notice Sent
Date: December 08, 2023Interrogatories
Date: June 30, 2023Notice of Filing of Medical Records
Date: May 05, 2023Proposed Order
Date: November 20, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: May 19, 2023Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: March 27, 2024Notice Sent
Date: February 23, 2024Agreed Order, Signed
Date: August 14, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: December 06, 2023Notice of Filing of Medical Records
Date: May 18, 2023Notice
Date: March 07, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: July 26, 2023Rule 11 Agreement Reviewed and Returned by Court
Date: August 11, 2023Notice Sent
Date: March 29, 2023Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: March 28, 2023Citation Issued
Date: January 05, 2023Proposed Order
Date: April 15, 2024Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: November 14, 2023Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: December 29, 2023Proposed Order
Date: July 26, 2023Amended Petition
Date: January 05, 2023Order Signed
Date: March 29, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: March 28, 2024Proposed Order
Date: May 15, 2023Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: December 11, 2023Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: November 21, 2023Notice Sent
Date: July 27, 2023Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: December 06, 2023Notice Sent
Date: August 14, 2023Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: March 22, 2024Original Petition (OCA)
Date: January 03, 2023Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: February 12, 2024Order Setting Hearing
Date: February 22, 2024Notice of Filing of Billing Records
Date: June 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance, Filed | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion For Summary Judgment Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Flores, Bobby) 03/25/2024 Reset by Court to 04/03/2024 04/03/2024 Reset by Court to 04/15/2024 Result: Held | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Objection AND REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S NO-EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S NO-EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ORDER PARTIALLY DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ORDER PARTIALLY DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER PARTIALLY DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ORDER PARTIALLY DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER PARTIALLY DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ORDER PARTIALLY DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.