Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Degollado, Jose, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Todd A. Hunter, Jr., against Artur Logostics Corporation, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Tamalashvili, Mirian, represented by Brian G. Cano, Scott A. Seelhoff, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Ysmael D. Fonseca presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2023 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Citation Issued
Date: January 05, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 14, 2023Notice Sent
Date: April 14, 2023Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Date: September 25, 2023Defendant's Original Answer
Date: January 24, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: September 22, 2023Cover Letter
Date: January 05, 2023Order Signed
Date: April 10, 2023Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: September 19, 2023Transfer to 476th District Court
Date: August 04, 2023Notice Sent
Date: September 05, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: September 01, 2023Objection
Date: June 23, 2023Cover Letter
Date: April 03, 2023Notice Sent
Date: September 25, 2023Notice Sent
Date: April 14, 2023Defendant's Original Answer
Date: January 30, 2023Original Petition (OCA)
Date: January 03, 2023Order Signed
Date: April 03, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: February 03, 2023Cover Letter
Date: April 03, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 13, 2023Amended
Date: May 01, 2023Order Signed
Date: October 18, 2023Request for Service
Date: January 03, 2023Proposed Order
Date: June 29, 2023Amended Petition
Date: March 30, 2023Response
Date: May 30, 2023Notice Sent
Date: August 15, 2023Proposed Order
Date: September 21, 2023Notice Sent
Date: October 18, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: April 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Signed GRANTING MOTION TO BIFURCATE AND DENYING MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER VENUE GRANTING MOTION TO BIFURCATE AND DENYING MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER VENUE |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BIFURCATE AND DENYING MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER VENUE ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BIFURCATE AND DENYING MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER VENUE |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Entries ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BIFURCATE AND DENYING MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER VENUE SIGNED BY COURT AND SENT TO CLRK TO SEND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES.RMN ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BIFURCATE AND DENYING MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER VENUE SIGNED BY COURT AND SENT TO CLRK TO SEND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Entries ATTY ROB GEORGE PRESENT. ATTY ALEX TIFFANY, ATTY STEVGE MENGIS PRESENT. JUDGE TO ISSUE RULING BY END OF DAY TICKLER JUDGE FONSECA 10.18.23 MDL ATTY ROB GEORGE PRESENT. ATTY ALEX TIFFANY, ATTY STEVGE MENGIS PRESENT. JUDGE TO ISSUE RULING BY END OF DAY TICKLER JUDGE FONSECA 10.18.23 MDL |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr.) CSE TRANSFERRED FROM 275TH/ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS - OSH SIGNED ON 9-1-2023 RMN 09/26/2023 Continued to 10/18/2023 - Per Attorney General Request - Artur Logostics Corporation; Degollado, Jose; Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company; Tamalashvili, Mirian Result: Held CSE TRANSFERRED FROM 275TH/ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS - OSH SIGNED ON 9-1-2023 RMN |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr.) CSE TRANSFERRED FROM 275TH/ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS - OSH SIGNED ON 9-1-2023 RMN 09/26/2023 Continued to 10/18/2023 - Per Attorney General Request - Artur Logostics Corporation; Degollado, Jose; Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company; Tamalashvili, Mirian CSE TRANSFERRED FROM 275TH/ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS - OSH SIGNED ON 9-1-2023 RMN |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Phone Call ASST JACKLYN W/DEF.ATTY CALLED AND CONFIRMING IF HRG SET FOR 10-18-2023 IS IN PERSON HRG.COURT CONFIRMED.RMN ASST JACKLYN W/DEF.ATTY CALLED AND CONFIRMING IF HRG SET FOR 10-18-2023 IS IN PERSON HRG.COURT CONFIRMED |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Phone Call ATTY A.TIFFANY NOTED HRG SET FOR 10-18-2023@9AM. INFORMED HRG SET FOR STHR.IN PERSON.RMN ATTY A.TIFFANY NOTED HRG SET FOR 10-18-2023@9AM. INFORMED HRG SET FOR STHR.IN PERSON |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER RESETTING HEARING ORDER RESETTING HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.