Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Frost Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by John R. Resendez, against Gladiator Contractor And Roofing, Llc, Guerra, Rebeca, Lopez, Jr, Gabriel Manuel, represented by Juan 'Sonny' Palacios, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 10, 2019 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract (Oca) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Order, Signed
Date: May 18, 2022Order Filed
Date: May 17, 2022Order Filed
Date: May 17, 2022Order Filed
Date: May 17, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 29, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 04, 2022Order Filed
Date: March 15, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: March 16, 2022Order Filed
Date: March 16, 2022Returned Mail
Date: December 18, 2020Order Filed
Date: March 15, 2022Order Filed
Date: February 03, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: December 04, 2020Order Filed
Date: January 14, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: December 07, 2020Order Filed
Date: December 03, 2020Motion
Date: December 02, 2020Order Filed
Date: December 03, 2020Order Filed
Date: December 03, 2020Order Filed
Date: December 02, 2020Motion
Date: December 03, 2020Order Filed
Date: December 01, 2020Order Filed
Date: November 30, 2020Other
Date: November 30, 2020Motion
Date: November 30, 2020Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: November 07, 2019Service Returned - Served
Date: November 26, 2019Service Returned - Served
Date: November 26, 2019Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: November 07, 2019Service Returned - Served
Date: November 07, 2019Order, Signed
Date: October 30, 2019Motion
Date: October 24, 2019Order, Signed
Date: October 29, 2019Order Filed
Date: October 24, 2019Order Filed
Date: October 28, 2019Order Filed
Date: October 24, 2019Motion
Date: October 24, 2019Citation Issued
Date: May 28, 2019Citation Issued
Date: May 28, 2019Citation Issued
Date: May 28, 2019Original Petition (OCA)
Date: May 10, 2019Order Filed
Date: May 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed FINAL JUDGMENT FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Final Judgment, signed. Final Judgment, signed. |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Final Judgment Final Judgment |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Default Judgment Against Rebeca Guerra Default Judgment Against Rebeca Guerra |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Proposed final judgment. Proposed final judgment. |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Case called for hearing Via Zoom and Atty. Josh Cottle was present and appeared virtually. No show from Defendants and no answer to Default or MSJ on file. Court heard arguments of counsel and Court granted MSJ for all Defendants and Default Judgment Granted as to Rebecca Guerra, ONLY. Orders to be submitted for Judge's signature. Case called for hearing Via Zoom and Atty. Josh Cottle was present and appeared virtually. No show from Defendants and no answer to Default or MSJ on file. Court heard arguments of counsel and Court granted MSJ for all Defendants and Default Judgment Granted as to Rebecca Guerra, ONLY. Orders to be submitted for Judge's signature. |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Default Hearing (2:00 PM) () **VIA ZOOM HEARING* Motion against Rebecca Guerra 05/16/2022 Reset by Court to 05/17/2022 **VIA ZOOM HEARING* Motion against Rebecca Guerra |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion For Summary Judgment (2:00 PM) () **P's Motion Against Gabriel Lopez, Jr. - VIA ZOOM HEARING** 05/16/2022 Reset by Court to 05/17/2022 **P's Motion Against Gabriel Lopez, Jr. - VIA ZOOM HEARING** |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Filed final judgment final judgment |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed Amended Order Re-Setting Default Judment and Mot. for Summ. Judg. Hearing from May 16, 2022 @ 10:00 a.m. to May 17, 2022 @ 2:00 p.m. mailed to Rebecca Guerra mailed notice to def Amended Order Re-Setting Default Judment and Mot. for Summ. Judg. Hearing from May 16, 2022 @ 10:00 a.m. to May 17, 2022 @ 2:00 p.m. mailed to Rebecca Guerra mailed notice to def |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.