Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Canales, Raul J, Rosales Gonzalez, Ezequiel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Langdon Milton Smith, Iii, against Macias, Sebastian S, Ms Transportation, Llc, represented by Douglas E. Chaves, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Rose Guerra Reyna presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2019 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order Of Dismissal |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: September 20, 2021Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: September 01, 2021Notice of Delivery
Date: April 27, 2022Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: August 30, 2021Order of Dismissal, Signed
Date: August 23, 2021Letter Received
Date: June 09, 2021Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: May 26, 2021Amended Petition
Date: May 21, 2021Objection
Date: May 03, 2021Amended Answer
Date: May 25, 2021Order Signed
Date: May 11, 2021Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys
Date: April 29, 2021Notice of Delivery
Date: April 26, 2021Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: March 17, 2021Objection
Date: April 15, 2021Amended Petition
Date: February 26, 2021Amended Answer
Date: March 05, 2021Notice of Delivery
Date: January 14, 2021Defendant's Original Answer
Date: January 11, 2021Notice Sent
Date: January 08, 2021Response
Date: January 06, 2021Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: January 08, 2021Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys
Date: January 05, 2021Court Entries
Date: January 05, 2021Amended
Date: January 04, 2021Designation of Experts
Date: December 28, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: January 04, 2021Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: December 28, 2020Notice Sent
Date: December 18, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: December 18, 2020Order Returned by Court
Date: December 17, 2020Motion
Date: December 17, 2020Notice Sent
Date: December 03, 2020Designation of Experts
Date: November 30, 2020Order Signed
Date: December 02, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: November 25, 2020Notice Sent
Date: November 25, 2020Response
Date: November 12, 2020Court Entries
Date: November 17, 2020Notice Sent
Date: November 05, 2020Order Returned by Court
Date: November 12, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: November 04, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: November 04, 2020Amended Petition
Date: October 19, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: October 19, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: October 05, 2020Affidavit
Date: September 16, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: September 08, 2020Notice of Filing of Affidavits with Exhibits
Date: September 16, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: September 08, 2020Notice Sent
Date: September 02, 2020Proposed Order
Date: September 02, 2020Order Signed
Date: September 02, 2020Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: August 28, 2020Court Entries
Date: September 01, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: August 19, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: August 19, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: August 19, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: August 12, 2020Notice Sent
Date: August 12, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: August 04, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: August 04, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: August 04, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: August 04, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: August 04, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: August 04, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: August 04, 2020Order Returned by Court
Date: July 28, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: July 27, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: July 21, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: July 21, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: July 21, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: July 21, 2020Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: July 17, 2020Affidavit
Date: July 17, 2020Affidavit
Date: June 19, 2020Affidavit
Date: June 19, 2020Affidavit
Date: June 19, 2020Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: May 16, 2020Notice
Date: June 19, 2020Notice Sent
Date: May 18, 2020Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: May 14, 2020Rule 11 Agreement Reviewed and Returned by Court
Date: May 08, 2020Notice Sent
Date: May 01, 2020Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: May 08, 2020Answer
Date: April 24, 2020Rule 11 Agreement Reviewed and Returned by Court
Date: April 23, 2020Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: April 23, 2020Notice Sent
Date: February 12, 2020Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: April 15, 2020Amended Answer
Date: April 17, 2020Amended Petition
Date: April 22, 2020Defendant's Original Answer
Date: March 09, 2020Motion for Substitute Service, Filed
Date: January 31, 2020Citation Issued
Date: December 19, 2019Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 17, 2019Response
Date: November 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Delivery EMPLOYMENT AND PAYROLL REQUESTED FROM TRI-RECYCLING, INC EMPLOYMENT AND PAYROLL REQUESTED FROM TRI-RECYCLING, INC Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition AURELIO GUTIERREZ AURELIO GUTIERREZ Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) (5 days) (5 days) |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tickler Case Disposed CANCELED Tickler (5:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Case Disposed CLERKS TO DISPOSE CASE 08/24/2021 Reset by Court to 08/31/2021 08/31/2021 Reset by Court to 09/07/2021 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition CAROLE DEVOS CAROLE DEVOS Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition CHARLES W. KENNEDY JR., MD CHARLES W. KENNEDY JR., MD Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Paid AGREED ORDER - PARTY INCURRED AGREED ORDER - PARTY INCURRED Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal, Signed AGREED OF ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AGREED OF ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.