Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cantu Zavala, Roberto C., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ricardo Garcia, against Long, Mary Lynn, Mesilla Valley Transportation Solutions, Llc, Mvt Services Llc Dba Mesilla Valley Transportation, represented by David L. Ortega, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Rose Guerra Reyna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRose Guerra Reyna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2019 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suit |
Court Costs Paid
Date: May 26, 2021Letter Received
Date: May 07, 2021Order, Signed
Date: May 26, 2021Order for Non-Suit, Signed
Date: May 25, 2021Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: January 14, 2021Notice of Non-Suit, Filed
Date: May 25, 2021Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys
Date: January 14, 2021Notice Sent
Date: January 14, 2021Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys
Date: January 06, 2021Order for Continuance, Signed
Date: December 16, 2020Notice Sent
Date: December 16, 2020Order Returned by Court
Date: December 16, 2020Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: December 15, 2020Court Entries
Date: December 15, 2020Notice Sent
Date: February 25, 2020Objection
Date: February 25, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: October 21, 2020Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys
Date: May 22, 2020Notice Sent
Date: March 19, 2020Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: March 19, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: February 25, 2020Notice Sent
Date: February 12, 2020Defendant's Original Answer
Date: February 24, 2020Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys
Date: February 24, 2020Notice
Date: February 13, 2020Order Setting Hearing
Date: January 23, 2020Letter Received
Date: February 11, 2020Notice
Date: February 12, 2020Notice Sent
Date: January 27, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: January 27, 2020Motion
Date: January 23, 2020Notice
Date: January 23, 2020Answer
Date: January 23, 2020Citation Issued
Date: December 12, 2019Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial on Merits Case Disposed CANCELED Trial on Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Case Disposed ( 3 Days ) Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial on Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) ( 3 Days ) ( 3 Days ) |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Pre-Trial Hearing Case Disposed CANCELED Final Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Case Disposed Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
First Pretrial Case Disposed CANCELED First Pretrial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Case Disposed Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | First Pretrial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tickler Other CANCELED Tickler (5:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Other CLERKS TO DISPOSE CASE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Paid NONSUIT/ PARTY INCURRED NONSUIT/ PARTY INCURRED Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed ORDER OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE; SENT TO D/C QUEUE ORDER OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE; SENT TO D/C QUEUE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.