Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Guajardo, Marvin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mario Cisneros, against Koshteryk, Pavlo, Moldex Inc, represented by Ricardo Villanueva, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Court Costs Paid
Date: October 13, 2021Notice of Removal to Federal Court, Filed (OCA) (1b)
Date: October 06, 2021Jury Demand
Date: October 05, 2021Answer
Date: October 05, 2021Citation Issued
Date: August 26, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: August 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Paid PARTY INCURRED PARTY INCURRED |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Removal to Federal Court, Filed (OCA) (1b) | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Demand | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation Issued |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Moldex Inc Unserved KOSHTERYK, PAVLO Unserved | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.