Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Coronado, Marcos Eduardo, Cuellar, Dominic Lee, Rivas, Ana Laura, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bertha Nelda Barba, against All Valley Waste, Llc, Avila, Sergio, represented by Edward L. Osuna, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice Signed |
Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: November 01, 2021Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: November 01, 2021Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: November 01, 2021Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: November 01, 2021Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: November 01, 2021Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: November 01, 2021Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: November 01, 2021Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: November 01, 2021Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: November 01, 2021Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: November 01, 2021Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: September 21, 2021Notice
Date: September 21, 2021Citation Issued
Date: August 24, 2021Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: September 21, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: August 23, 2021Defendant's Original Answer
Date: September 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Affidavits with Exhibits
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions VALLEY SPINE MEDICAL CENTER RE: MEDICAL RECORDS VALLEY SPINE MEDICAL CENTER RE: MEDICAL RECORDS Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions VALLEY SPINE MEDICAL CENTER RE: RADIOLOGY RECORDS VALLEY SPINE MEDICAL CENTER RE: RADIOLOGY RECORDS Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions RMH BUSINESS SERVICES, LLC RE: RADIOLOGY RECORDS RMH BUSINESS SERVICES, LLC RE: RADIOLOGY RECORDS Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions DAYSTAR OPEN MRI RE: RADIOLOGY RECORDS DAYSTAR OPEN MRI RE: RADIOLOGY RECORDS Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions PHYSICIANS INJURY CLINIC RE: RADIOLOGY RECORDS PHYSICIANS INJURY CLINIC RE: RADIOLOGY RECORDS Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions DAYSTAR OPEN MRI RE: MEDICAL RECORDS DAYSTAR OPEN MRI RE: MEDICAL RECORDS Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions 911 PAIN MANAGEMENT RE: MEDICAL RECORDS 911 PAIN MANAGEMENT RE: MEDICAL RECORDS Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions RMH BUSINESS SERVICES, LLC RE: MEDICAL RECORDS RMH BUSINESS SERVICES, LLC RE: MEDICAL RECORDS Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions PHYSICIANS INJURY CLINIC RE: MEDICAL RECORDS PHYSICIANS INJURY CLINIC RE: MEDICAL RECORDS Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.