Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Daniel Mora, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Israel Ramon, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsrael Ramon, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suit |
Notice Sent
Date: September 01, 2021Motion for Non-Suit
Date: August 31, 2021Order for Non-Suit, Signed
Date: August 31, 2021Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed
Date: August 31, 2021Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Proposed Order
Date: August 31, 2021Order Returned by Court
Date: August 24, 2021Notice Sent
Date: August 20, 2021Writ Issued
Date: August 20, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: August 19, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: August 18, 2021Proposed Order
Date: August 18, 2021Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: August 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Cost Waived HABEAS CORPUS HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER OF NONSUIT ORDER OF NONSUIT Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Non-Suit
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit, Signed
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed DANIEL MORA III - $155.00 DANIEL MORA III - $155.00 Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Filed
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ON MOTION FOR NONSUIT ON MOTION FOR NONSUIT Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed Daniel Mora, III - $155.00 Daniel Mora, III - $155.00 Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.