Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Ricardo A. Flores, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Noe Gonzalez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNoe Gonzalez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 18, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeOther |
Notice Sent to HCSO
Date: June 28, 2021Order of Commitment, Signed
Date: June 28, 2021Writ Issued
Date: June 23, 2021Notice Sent
Date: June 23, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: June 22, 2021Proposed Order
Date: June 18, 2021Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: June 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent to HCSO ORDER OF RELEASE/COMMITMENT ORDER OF RELEASE/COMMITMENT Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Commitment, Signed
Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Noe)
Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries JAY GARZA AND RICARDO FLORES APPEARED VIA-ZOOM; BONDS REDUCED TO 25K C/S ON AGG. ROBBERY; 5K C/S ON POM. LB JAY GARZA AND RICARDO FLORES APPEARED VIA-ZOOM; BONDS REDUCED TO 25K C/S ON AGG. ROBBERY; 5K C/S ON POM. LB Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ Issued Writ Issued Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER OF SETTING ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ORDER OF SETTING ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ LEAL, JEWEL LYNN Served 06/23/2021 Returned 06/24/2021
Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION ORDER ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.