Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Roel Esquivel, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Vasquez, L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVasquez, L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 18, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Order of Commitment, Signed
Date: June 30, 2021Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: June 18, 2021Proposed Order
Date: June 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Cost Waived HABEAS CORPUS HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent to HCSO ORDER OF COMMITMENT SIGNED ORDER OF COMMITMENT SIGNED Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Commitment, Signed
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Filed
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ATTORNEY FEE FORM ATTORNEY FEE FORM Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Called zoom hearing, all parties present, bond granted zoom hearing, all parties present, bond granted Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno")
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.