Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Salazar De La Cruz, Maria, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Michael J. Cisneros, against El Pato Mexican Food, L.P., represented by John R Griffith, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice Signed |
Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, Signed
Date: August 02, 2022Court Costs Paid
Date: August 11, 2022Notice of Delivery
Date: August 09, 2022Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: August 02, 2022Proposed Order
Date: August 02, 2022Motion to Dismiss, Filed
Date: August 02, 2022Notice
Date: July 15, 2022Notice of Delivery
Date: June 17, 2022Notice of Intent to Take Written Deposition
Date: July 05, 2022Notice of Delivery
Date: June 16, 2022Letter Received
Date: July 15, 2022Certification
Date: May 25, 2022Notice of Delivery
Date: May 10, 2022Notice
Date: May 26, 2022Certification
Date: November 24, 2021Officer's Certification (Deposition)
Date: November 22, 2021Notice of Delivery
Date: November 08, 2021Amended
Date: September 23, 2021Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: August 09, 2021Notice Sent
Date: August 06, 2021Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: August 06, 2021Proposed Order
Date: August 06, 2021Notice Sent
Date: July 20, 2021Citation Issued
Date: June 14, 2021Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: July 20, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: July 19, 2021Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: July 19, 2021Defendant's Original Answer
Date: June 30, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: June 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Paid AGREED ORDER AGREED ORDER Judge: Flores, Bobby) Comment (AGREED |
|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Delivery RE: STHS ER MONTE CRISTO - BILLING RECORDS RE: STHS ER MONTE CRISTO - BILLING RECORDS Judge: Flores, Bobby) Comment (AGREED |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, Signed AGREED AGREED Judge: Flores, Bobby) Comment (AGREED |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Flores, Bobby) Comment (AGREED |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Flores, Bobby) Comment (AGREED |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Flores, Bobby) Comment (AGREED |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss, Filed WITH PREJUDICE WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Flores, Bobby) Comment (AGREED |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial / Trial Other CANCELED Pre Trial / Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Flores, Bobby) Other 3-4 Day Trial Judge: Flores, Bobby) Comment (AGREED |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial / Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Flores, Bobby) 3-4 Day Trial 3-4 Day Trial |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice OF SETTLEMENT OF SETTLEMENT Judge: Flores, Bobby) Comment (AGREED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.