Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Credit Corp Solutions Inc., filed a(n) 3 case represented by Nathan Collins, against Sullivan, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Harrison County, TX, . Harrison County, TX Superior Courts with Smith, R. Michael presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2022 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHarrison County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | CONTINUANCE | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Smith, R. Michael |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
CONTINUANCE
Judge: Smith, R. Michael |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF SERVICE
Judge: Smith, R. Michael |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
REQUESTS
Judge: Smith, R. Michael |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Smith, R. Michael |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Smith, R. Michael |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.