Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Harrison County, TX, . Harrison County, TX Superior Courts with Morin, Brad presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2016 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarrison County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION
Judge: Morin, Brad |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER
Judge: Morin, Brad |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
VACATION LETTER
Judge: Morin, Brad |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL (Judicial Officer: Morin, Brad )
Judge: Morin, Brad |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL
Judge: Morin, Brad |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
VACATION LETTER
Judge: Morin, Brad |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Judge: Morin, Brad |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Judge: Morin, Brad |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order
Judge: Morin, Brad |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE
Judge: Morin, Brad |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.