Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Harrison County, TX, . Harrison County, TX Superior Courts with Morin, Brad presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2014 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedApril 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHarrison County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Morin, Brad |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER
Judge: Morin, Brad |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order
Judge: Morin, Brad |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE
Judge: Morin, Brad |
|
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Judge: Morin, Brad |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
MEMO
Judge: Morin, Brad |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE
Judge: Morin, Brad |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: Morin, Brad |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER
Judge: Morin, Brad |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE
Judge: Morin, Brad |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.