Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Mill Man Steel Inc, Mill Man Steel, Inc., filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Aguilar, Arturo Cuauhtemoc, against Haydin Construction Llc, Haydin Construction, Llc, Daryl M. Selzer&, Hood, Leigh Ann, Prime Development Group Llc, Selzer, Daryl M, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 334th with DAWN ROGERS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2023 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedMarch 08, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
|
Filing Court House334th |
Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: May 30, 2023Exhibit B
Date: June 06, 2023Citation Request
Date: June 21, 2023Exhibit A
Date: June 06, 2023Plaintiff's First Amended Petition
Date: June 06, 2023Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition
Date: June 15, 2023Plaintiff's Third Amended Petition
Date: June 21, 2023The State of Texas Subpoena to Produce Documents or Tangible Things
Date: June 21, 2023Exhibit 06
Date: June 22, 2023Exhibit 05
Date: June 22, 2023Exhibit 04
Date: June 22, 2023Exhibit 03
Date: June 22, 2023Exhibit 02
Date: June 22, 2023Plaintiff's Notice of Hearing(06.26.23)
Date: June 23, 2023Plaintiffs Notice of Hearing
Date: June 23, 2023Plaintiffs Notice of Emergency Hearing
Date: June 23, 2023ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED
Date: June 26, 2023Civil Process Pick-Up Form
Date: June 27, 2023Exhibit B - Declaration of Art Aguilar
Date: June 27, 2023Exhibit A
Date: June 27, 2023Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Date: July 20, 2023Letter to Court Emergency Hearing
Date: June 27, 2023Letter to Clerk-Service Request
Date: June 27, 2023Proposed Order
Date: July 20, 2023Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Petition
Date: August 29, 2023Citation Return - Jennifer Selzer
Date: August 30, 2023Proposed Order
Date: August 31, 2023Exhibit B
Date: August 31, 2023Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
Date: August 31, 2023Exhibit A
Date: August 31, 2023Notice of Submission (09.18.23)
Date: September 05, 2023Letter to Clerk
Date: August 31, 2023Plaintiff's 5th Amended Petition
Date: January 04, 2024ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING PRODUCTION
Date: October 05, 2023Discovery Request to Financial Institution per Section 59.006 of the Texas Finance Code
Date: December 12, 2023Letter to Clerk-Citation Request (SOS)
Date: November 06, 2023The State of Texas Secretary of State-Mckiernan
Date: January 08, 2024Vacation Letter
Date: February 15, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Vacation Letter | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | The State of Texas Secretary of State-Mckiernan | |
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's 5th Amended Petition | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Discovery Request to Financial Institution per Section 59.006 of the Texas Finance Code | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Discovery Request to Financial Institution per Section 59.006 of the Texas Finance Code | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Letter to Clerk-Citation Request (SOS) | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING PRODUCTION | |
September 18, 2023 |
COMPEL PRODUCTION (MOTION TO) Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) |
||
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Submission (09.18.23) | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.