Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Prince, Harrison, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Helstowski, John Gannon, against Angelo Christian Financial Llc, Escamilla, Brandon, Mainstar Trust Fbo Alan Schwartz Ira Account No T0896700, Superior Loan Servicing, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 080th with JERALYNN MANOR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJERALYNN MANOR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2022 |
CategoryOther Property |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court House080th |
ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED
Date: December 02, 2022Certificate of Conference
Date: December 02, 2022Exhibit B
Date: December 02, 2022PROPOSED TEMORARY ORDER
Date: December 02, 2022Exhibit A
Date: December 02, 2022Request to Issue Citations and TRO notices
Date: December 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2022 |
TEMPORARY INJUNCTION (MOTION FOR) Law Day Docket |
||
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND RE-SCHEDULING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION HEARING: | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND RE-SCHEDULE TEMPORARY INJUNCTION HEARING: | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Request to Issue Citations and TRO notices | |
December 02, 2022 |
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (MOTION FOR) Ancillary Docket O/S 12/2/2022 |
||
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Conference | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Exhibit B | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED TEMORARY ORDER | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Exhibit A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.