Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Shinouda, Ragheb, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Waters, Blake Anthony, against Cbre Incorporated, Wilson, Damien, represented by Raines, Elizabeth Stewart, Winton, Jason Cameron, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 061st with FREDERICKA PHILLIPS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 22, 2021 |
CategoryAssault - Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House061st |
Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: April 22, 2021DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: June 04, 2021Rule 11 Agreement
Date: August 11, 2021Defendant Cbre, Inc.'s Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: May 24, 2021Defendant's Original Answer
Date: May 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2022 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 194.2 & Expert Disclosure Pursuant to Rule 194.3 | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | DOCKET CONTROL ORDER | |
May 27, 2021 | DESIGNATED TRIAL READY | ||
May 26, 2021 | ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION | ||
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant's Original Answer | |
May 24, 2021 | ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION | ||
May 24, 2021 | JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.