Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hynson, Vickie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mccarthy, Jeffrey R, against Metropolitan Transit Authority Of Harris County Texas, represented by Easley, Toby C, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 055th with LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House055th |
PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Date: July 31, 2020Civil Process Request Form
Date: July 31, 2020DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: October 28, 2020Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Requests for Disclosure
Date: May 14, 2021DCA Generic Letter
Date: July 15, 2021Defendant Metropolitan Transit Authority's First Amended Original Answer
Date: May 25, 2021DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: August 12, 2021Defendant Metropolitan Transit Authority's Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 22, 2020Defendant's Designation of Expert Witnesses
Date: June 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2022 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
February 11, 2022 |
DOCKET CALL (MOTION FOR) Trial Coordinators Docket |
||
August 24, 2021 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
August 13, 2021 |
DOCKET CALL (MOTION FOR) Trial Coordinators Docket |
||
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | DOCKET CONTROL ORDER | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Reporter's Certification Oral Deposition of Vickie Hynson | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DCA Generic Letter | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant's Designation of Expert Witnesses | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.