Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Watkins, Amber, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Doyle, Michael P., against Brown, Camille, Praetorian Insurance Co, Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc, represented by Mccathern, Levi Glenn, Nelson, Joelle Grace, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 157th with TANYA GARRISON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Inj (Non-Auto) |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House157th |
Request for Citation
Date: July 27, 2020Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition
Date: August 07, 2020Attorney Vacation Letter
Date: February 19, 2021Memorandum Opinion and Order
Date: February 22, 2021Proposed Order Transferring Venue to Collin County
Date: February 23, 2021Proposed Order of Dismissal for Forum Non Conveniens
Date: February 23, 2021Proposed Interim Protective Order
Date: March 09, 2021Agreed Motion for Entry of Interim Protective Order
Date: March 09, 2021DOCKET CONTROL ORDER-JCVO02
Date: April 01, 2021Proposed Order of Dismissal for Forum Non Conveniens
Date: April 14, 2021Rule 11 Agreement
Date: April 14, 2021Proposed Order
Date: May 21, 2021Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 21, 2021Plaintiff's Amended Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 25, 2021ORDER SIGNED DENYING MOTION T0 DISMISS
Date: June 03, 2021Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens
Date: May 27, 2021Proposed Order
Date: May 25, 2021Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration
Date: July 14, 2021Proposed Order
Date: July 14, 2021Motion to Reconsider Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens
Date: June 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2022 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
July 16, 2021 |
RE-HEARING (MOTION FOR) Law Day Docket |
||
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Defendant Praetorian Insurance Co.'s Motion to Reconsider Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.'s, and Camille Brown's Joinder With Pratetorian Insurance Co.'s Motion to Reconsider | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of In-Person Hearing | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Reconsider Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit 1 | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance as Lead Counsel for Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc and Camille Brown |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.