Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Reeves, Philip Christopher, against Perry, Kesha Dian, Perry, Michael Antonio, The Heirs At Law Of Bonnie Gay Perry, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 151st with MIKE ENGELHART presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2020 |
CategoryQuiet Title |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Filing Court House151st |
Filing Letter
Date: March 23, 2020Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: March 23, 2020Defendant's Answer
Date: April 16, 2020ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GRANTED
Date: April 22, 2020ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: April 08, 2021Proposed Order Appointing Atorney Ad Litem
Date: April 22, 2020Motion to Appoint Atorney Ad Litem
Date: April 22, 2020Defendants' Original Answer
Date: June 18, 2020DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: May 29, 2020Citation by Publication Request
Date: June 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
July 05, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
June 25, 2021 |
DOCKET CALL (MOTION FOR) Trial Coordinators Docket WITH THE COORDINATOR |
||
June 25, 2021 |
DOCKET CALL Trial Coordinators Docket |
||
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | TRIAL.PREPARATION.ORDER | |
April 08, 2021 | ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (Temporary Order) | ||
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Exhibits | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Attorney Ad Litem Report to the Court | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Publisher's Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.