Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bryant, Carmen L, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lane, Robert Chamless, against Mr Cooper, Nationstar Mortgage Llc, Us Bank National Association (As Trustee For Asset Backed Securities, represented by Sutton, Heather, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 165th with URSULA A. HALL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2019 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court House165th |
First request for production
Date: September 25, 2019Defendants' Original Answer and Affirmative Defendses To Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: October 25, 2019DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: December 19, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: March 17, 2020Proposed Order Granting Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement
Date: June 23, 2020Defendant's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement
Date: June 23, 2020Proposed Order
Date: March 26, 2020Unopposed motion to withdraw as counsel
Date: March 26, 2020ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY SIGNED
Date: July 01, 2020Proposed Order
Date: June 24, 2020Letter
Date: September 01, 2020First request for admissions
Date: September 25, 2019First set of interrogatories
Date: September 25, 2019DCA Generic Letter
Date: December 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting CASE SETTLED |
||
December 14, 2020 |
STATUS CONFERENCE Trial Coordinators Docket CASE SETTLED |
||
December 07, 2020 |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE (NO TCR) Trial Coordinators Docket CASE SETTLED |
||
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing by Submission | |
August 17, 2020 |
MTN TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) |
||
August 06, 2020 |
MTN TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT Law Day Docket PER SURPREME COURT ORDER |
||
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing by Submission | |
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY SIGNED | |
July 01, 2020 | ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY SIGNED (Temporary Order) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.