Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Aguayo, April, Aguayo, Daniela, Aguayo, Emily, Aguayo, Faith E, Aguayo, Marcie C, (total of 10) See All filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Buzbee, Anthony Glenn, Garcia, Christopher Charles, against Cypress Fairbanks Independent School District, Ohms Corporation Of Houston, Ohms Electrical Inspection Services Inc, Purcell Construction Inc, represented by Smith, James David, Stergio, Anthony G., Zito, Nicholas E., in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 080th with JERALYNN MANOR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJERALYNN MANOR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2019 |
CategoryPersonal Inj (Non-Auto) |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House080th |
Purcell Construction INCs Original Answer to Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: September 20, 2019ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: March 09, 2021Filing Letter
Date: October 11, 2019Plaintiffs First Amended Petition
Date: October 11, 2019ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED
Date: October 14, 2019Proposed Order of Dismissal without Prejudice
Date: December 06, 2019Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice
Date: December 06, 2019PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION
Date: December 06, 2019Defendant Purcell Construction INCs Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: November 25, 2019Proposed Order Granting Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: November 25, 2019Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion and Allowing Withdrawal of Admissions
Date: March 19, 2020Defendant Purcell Construction INCs Motion to Withdraw Admissions
Date: March 19, 2020Plaintiffs' Designation of Expert Witnesses
Date: April 13, 2020Filing Letter
Date: April 13, 2020Notice of Agreement on Alternative Dispute Resolution
Date: April 13, 2020ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE PLEADING SIGNED
Date: April 15, 2020Proposed Agreed Order
Date: May 08, 2020Filing Letter
Date: May 08, 2020Proposed Agreed First Amended Docket Control Order
Date: May 08, 2020ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: May 27, 2020Proposed Agreed First Amended Docket Control Order
Date: May 27, 2020Proposed Agreed Order
Date: May 27, 2020ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: May 29, 2020Proposed Agreed Order Granting Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: June 11, 2020ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Date: June 15, 2020Joint Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement
Date: June 24, 2020DEFENDANT PURCELL CONSTRUCTION INCS FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: June 30, 2020Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order:
Date: March 01, 2021Proposed Order
Date: January 06, 2021Filing Letter
Date: December 15, 2020ORDER SIGNED GRANTING LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE 3RD PARTY
Date: January 18, 2021Motion to Quash
Date: August 26, 2020The OHMS Corporations No Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: December 15, 2020Proposed Order Dismissing OHMS
Date: December 15, 2020DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: March 03, 2021LETTER FROM ROXANNE THOMAS PASSING THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET FOR FEBRUARY 26, 2021:
Date: February 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2022 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
March 15, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RESETTING TRIAL | |
March 03, 2021 | DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order: | |
February 26, 2021 |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT - MOTION FOR FINAL (TRCP 166A) Law Day Docket PER ROXANNE 2.22@10:40AM |
||
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ROXANNE THOMAS PASSING THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET FOR FEBRUARY 26, 2021: | |
January 18, 2021 | ORDER SIGNED GRANTING LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE 3RD PARTY (Temporary Order) | ||
January 18, 2021 |
LEAVE DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE 3RD PARTY Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) O/S 1.18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.