Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ozueh, Christopher, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Desimone, Donald G., Desimone, Donald George, against Truong, Tin Trung, represented by Osborn, Shane, Osborn, William Shane, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 151st with MIKE ENGELHART presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House151st |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Non-Suit Signed |
Interrogatories
Date: July 05, 2019Request for Production
Date: July 05, 2019Plaintiff's Original Petition with Request for Disclosures
Date: July 05, 2019Civil Process Request
Date: July 05, 2019DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: October 17, 2019ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE PLEADING SIGNED
Date: March 08, 2020Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Serve Counteraffidavits
Date: March 06, 2020Proposed Order
Date: March 06, 2020Plaintiff's Designation of Expert Witnesses
Date: March 16, 2020Proposed Order on Defendant's Objection to Alternative Dispute Resolution
Date: June 08, 2020Defendant's Objection to Alternative Dispute Resolution
Date: June 08, 2020TRIAL.PREPARATION.ORDER
Date: August 06, 2020Proposed Order
Date: July 28, 2020Defendant's Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Experts
Date: July 28, 2020Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Experts
Date: August 14, 2020Plaintiff Supplemental Designation of Expert Witnesses
Date: August 14, 2020Proposed Order
Date: August 19, 2020Proposed Order
Date: August 21, 2020Notice of Consideration by Submission on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave
Date: August 19, 2020ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: August 26, 2020ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME SIGNED
Date: August 26, 2020ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE PLEADING SIGNED
Date: August 26, 2020Defendant's Response to Trial Preparation Order
Date: August 27, 2020Defendant's Motion in Limine
Date: August 27, 2020ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: February 08, 2021Proposed Order for Nonsuit with Prejudice
Date: April 05, 2021ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED
Date: April 05, 2021Agreed Motion for Nonsuit with Prejudice
Date: April 05, 2021Proposed Order
Date: August 14, 2020ORD SGND DENYING MTN TO STRIKE EXPERTS
Date: August 26, 2020Plaitniff's Designation of Expert Witnesses
Date: March 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
April 05, 2021 | EACH PAY OWN | ||
April 05, 2021 | ORDER OF NONSUIT SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order for Nonsuit with Prejudice | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Agreed Motion for Nonsuit with Prejudice | |
March 01, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting PER COURT |
||
February 08, 2021 | ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL(Temporary Order) | ||
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Delivery |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.